Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:William M Conley
Referred: Anita Marie Boor
Case #: 3:24-cv-00558
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:13 AM CST
Defendant
Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC
Represented By
Andrew Riley Brehm
Scopelitis, Garvin, Light, Hanson & Feary, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Vanessa Schwengel
Represented By
Max Thomas Lindsey
Anich, Wickman & Lindsey, S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 10:44 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Sara Lynne Pettinger for Defendant Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (Pettinger, Sara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/01 4:24 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendant has filed an unopposed motion to extend, Dkt.11 , asking to move the dispositive motion deadline from April 30 to May 21. Defendant reports it needs additional time to take depositions, and also that one of its attorneys will be on leave for some of the intervening time. The court expects parties to take discovery in advance of deadlines to preserve the case schedule, so the first reason does not provide much good cause. That said, the parties are working together, and the court wishes to facilitate that cooperation. Moreover, this request is more modest than the one the court previously denied. Dkt. 10 . The court needs to leave sufficient time between dispositive motions and trial to allow the court time to rule on any motions. The court will GRANT this request, but this moves the deadline as close to trial as the court can manage. The deadline for dispositive motions is RESET to May 21, 2025. All other deadlines remain in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 4/1/2025. (rks)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time Tue 04/01 1:54 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Dispositive Motions by Defendant Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (Brehm, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
10 10 order Order on Stipulation Fri 03/07 4:06 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties filed a stipulation to amend the preliminary pretrial conference order, Dkt.9 , asking to move the dispositive motion deadline approximately seven weeks from April 30 to June 16, 2025. Parties may not move the dispositive motion deadline by stipulation; they must seek leave of court, and the court grants leave for good cause only. Dkt.8 at 2-3. The parties do not offer much in the way of reasons. They say they wish to take more discovery before the dispositive motion deadline, but it is not clear what discovery exactly or why they could not have taken in in the time given. Beyond this, the deadline is not for many weeks, so it is not clear why the parties cannot take the discovery in the intervening time. The court needs to leave sufficient time between dispositive motions and trial in order to rule on the motions in advance of trial-related deadlines. The court cannot find good cause to move the deadline, so the request is DENIED. The parties should make best efforts to litigate the case in a manner to preserve the schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 3/07/2025. (nln)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
9 9 motion Stipulation Thu 03/06 2:14 PM
Stipulation to Amend Preliminary Pretrial Order by Defendant Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (Brehm, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 03, 2024
8 8 order Pretrial Conference Order Thu 10/03 3:27 PM
Pretrial Conference Order -[LINK:Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley] attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 11/4/2024. Dispositive Motions due 4/30/2025. Settlement Letters due 9/19/2025. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 9/26/2025. Responses due 10/10/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2025 at 02:30 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2025 at 02:30 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/3/2025 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor on 10/3/24. (jat)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference Thu 10/03 2:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anita Marie Boor: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/3/2024 [00:13] (ckl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
7 7 misc Joint Final Pretrial Conference Report Wed 09/25 4:25 PM
Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendant Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC (Brehm, Andrew) Modified on 9/25/2024. (lak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
utility Set Pretrial or Status Conference Wed 09/11 10:57 AM
Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Please call (669) 254-5252 and enter meeting ID 161 2455 6623 when prompted. Wait to be admitted into the conference. The parties are advised that a Rule 26(f) conference shall occur not less than two weeks before the preliminary pretrial conference, and that the parties' report or reports must be filed not less than one week before the preliminary pretrial conference.[[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (nln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/10 10:05 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (Brehm, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/09 4:26 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (Brehm, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/05 1:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (Brehm, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
misc Action Requested Tue 09/03 10:41 AM
Action Requested: Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC's corporate disclosure statement is due. Please use this court's current form. (lak)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/30 3:51 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Riley Brehm for Defendant Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (Brehm, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 08/09 10:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (lak)
Related: [-]
utility Add Judge for Shell Case Opening Fri 08/09 9:59 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. (lak)
Related: [-]
utility Standard Attachments Sent Fri 08/09 9:59 AM
Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (lak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/08 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWIWDC-3471216.), filed by Vanessa Schwengel. (Lindsey, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Summons Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC,
Att: 2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet