New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jessica G L Clarke
Referred: Valerie Figueredo
Case #: 1:24-cv-06025
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 30, 2025 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
Fordham University
Represented By
Ryan Soebke
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin J. Delo
30 Ashwood Dr.
Blauvelt, NY 10913


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
35 35 order Memo Endorsement Mon 05/05 3:02 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:34 Letter filed by Fordham University. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will consider Plaintiff's supplemental submissions. If Defendant would like to respond, they are directed to do so by May 12, 2025. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 5/5/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
34 34 2 pgs misc Letter Wed 04/30 12:23 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Ryan Soebke dated April 30, 2025 re: Request for Court to Disregard Plaintiff's April 21, 2025 and April 23, 2025 Filings. Document filed by Fordham University..(Ronneburger, Ariel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
33 33 3 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/24 3:13 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF FORDHAM UNIVERSITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT in Opposition re:19 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Benjamin J. Delo..(ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
32 32 3 pgs respoth Response (non-motion) Wed 04/23 4:37 PM
RESPONSE re:31 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Benjamin J. Delo. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
31 31 11 pgs respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 04/17 1:02 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:19 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Fordham University..(Baylis, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/11 4:42 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's opposition at ECF No. 28, back dated to April 8, 2025, satisfies the Court's order at ECF No. 29. Plaintiff does not need to file anything else in relation to the pending motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 4/11/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/10 12:04 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff filed documents at ECF Nos. 25 and 26 in response to Defendant's motion to dismiss. At ECF No. 26, Plaintiff referred to an attached "clarification in Opposition." But no such document was attached to Plaintiff's filings. Plaintiff was therefore directed to refile his brief in opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss by April 9, 2025. That date has now passed, and Plaintiff has not re-filed his opposition. Plaintiff is directed to do so by Thursday, April 17, 2025. Defendant is also directed to file on the docket any memorandum Plaintiff emailed to Defendant's counsel in opposition to the motion to dismiss by Thursday, April 17, 2025. Defendant is then direct to file a reply brief, if any, by Thursday, May 1, 2025. ( Responses due by 4/17/2025, Replies due by 5/1/2025.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 4/10/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
28 28 5 pgs respm Response to Motion Thu 04/10 11:41 AM
ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS re:19 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Benjamin J. Delo. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit answer to motion
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/02 2:27 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff filed documents at ECF Nos. 25 and 26 in response to Defendant's motion to dismiss. At ECF No. 26, Plaintiff referred to an attached "clarification in Opposition." But no such document was attached to Plaintiff's filings. Plaintiff is therefore directed to refile his brief in opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss by April 9, 2025. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 4/9/2025) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 4/2/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
26 26 2 pgs respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/19 12:26 PM
DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re:19 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Benjamin J. Delo. (jjc)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/19 12:21 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION. Document filed by Benjamin J. Delo. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
24 24 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/18 3:57 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:23 Letter, filed by Benjamin J. Delo. ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby grants the request for an extension. Plaintiff is directed to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss by March 17, 2025. Defendant's reply is due April 7, 2025 ( Responses due by 3/17/2025, Replies due by 4/7/2025.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 2/18/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
23 23 misc Letter Fri 02/14 2:27 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke from Benjamin J. Delo dated 2/14/2025 re: I write to respectfully request an extension of time to serve and file opposition papers to Fordham Universitys response to the initial complaint to March 17th 2025. Document filed by Benjamin J. Delo. (tp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
22 22 18 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 01/17 4:51 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:19 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs respm Affirmation in Support of Motion Fri 01/17 4:49 PM
AFFIRMATION of Ryan Soebke in Support re:19 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 23 pgs Exhibit Complaint
20 20 service Affidavit of Service Other Fri 01/17 1:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE served on Benjamin J. Delo - Pro Se on January 17, 2025. Document filed by Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 01/17 12:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan)
Related: [-]
18 18 18 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 01/17 12:25 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (LINKED TO A DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:16 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan) Modified on 1/17/2025 (lb).
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 01/17 12:24 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (LINKED TO A DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ) - DECLARATION of Ryan Soebke in Support re:16 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan) Modified on 1/17/2025 (lb).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
16 16 18 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 01/17 12:22 PM
FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - - (SEE DOCUMENT#19) MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan) Modified on 1/17/2025 (lb).
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/13 11:45 AM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. The extension requested herein is GRANTED. Fordham University answer due 1/17/2025. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 12/13/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
14 14 1 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/12 2:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint . Document filed by Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/12 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Soebke on behalf of Fordham University..(Soebke, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
12 12 3 pgs misc Letter Fri 11/15 9:27 AM
LETTER addressed to Southern District NY Court and Pro Se Intake Unit from Benjamin Delo dated 11/14/2024 re: Please find attached the executed Waiver of Service form received on behalf of Fordham University. The form was executed by Fordhams counsel. Document filed by Benjamin J. Delo. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
11 11 25 pgs misc FRCP 4 Service Package - Mailed Thu 09/19 12:27 PM
INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Benjamin J. Delo, at, on 9/19/2024 Re:9 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 1 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (nb)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 09/19 12:25 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fordham University. (nb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order of Service Mon 09/16 5:59 PM
ORDER OF SERVICE: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action.The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons as to Defendant Fordham University. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summons. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has not either served Defendant or requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendant under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 9/16/2024) (ks) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/13 6:46 PM
ORDER: Based on Plaintiff's request at ECF No. 6, the Court deems Plaintiff to have filed an amended complaint. The complaint annexed to Plaintiff's letter at ECF No. 6 is hereby deemed Plaintiff's first amended complaint. The docket should reflect that Plaintiff has filed a first amended complaint at ECF No. 6. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 9/13/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Memo Endorsement Fri 09/13 6:41 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:6 Letter filed by Benjamin J. Delo ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff can propose redactions of personal information in the complaint and file a redacted copy of the complaint on the docket. The Court will review the proposed redactions, approve appropriate redactions, and seal the publicly filed version of the complaint on the docket. Plaintiff should submit proposed redactions by Friday, September 27, 2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 9/13/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
6 6 10 pgs misc Letter Thu 09/12 4:56 PM
LETTER addressed to Southern District NY Court from Benjamin Delo dated 9/11/2024 re: I have filed a complaint with the SDNY which has been docketed as 1:24-cv-06025-JGLC-VF Delo v. Fordham University.. Document filed by Benjamin J. Delo.(jjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
5 5 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Tue 09/03 10:49 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Benjamin J Delo consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Benjamin J. Delo.(tro)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 08/28 10:30 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 8/27/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 08/26 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 08/26 9:30 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
misc Pro Se Payment of Fee - Processed Fri 08/23 3:25 PM
Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $405.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 8/23/2024, Receipt Number 32264. (ehn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
4 4 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Wed 08/28 12:20 PM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Benjamin J Delo consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Benjamin J. Delo.(tro)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Mon 08/12 10:16 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 2. Mailed to: Benjamin J. Delo 30 Ashwood Dr. Blauvelt, NY 10913. (nb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
2 2 4 pgs order Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application Fri 08/09 2:17 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 9/9/2024. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 9/9/2024. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/9/2024) (vn)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Fri 08/09 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 03, 2024
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/08 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Fordham University. Document filed by Benjamin J. Delo..(rdz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 08/08 2:48 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]