New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:24-cv-06048
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Terminated:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:06 AM EST
Defendant
Stonehenge Health IP LLC
Represented By
Joseph Gerard Tully
Alston & Bird, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Cedric Bishop
150 E. 18 St.
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
12 12 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Mon 12/02 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Plaintiff(s), CEDRIC BISHOP, in accordance with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, hereby dismisses the above entitled action against Defendant, STONEHENGE HEALTH IP LLC, with prejudice and without fees and costs. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to strike the class action language from the caption. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/2/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/27 6:03 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Stonehenge Health IP LLC. Document filed by Cedric Bishop. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 11/26 11:24 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The Initial Pretrial Conference, currently scheduled for December 6, 2024, is ADJOURNED to December 20, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. The parties' joint letter and case management plan must be filed by no later than December 12, 2024. Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint is stayed until December 20, 2024. Initial Conference set for 12/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/26/2024) (jjc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 11/26 11:25 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Stonehenge Health IP LLC answer due 12/20/2024. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
9 9 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 11/25 4:46 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Pretrial addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph Tully dated November 25, 2024. Document filed by Stonehenge Health IP LLC..(Tully, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/25 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Gerard Tully on behalf of Stonehenge Health IP LLC..(Tully, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 09/12 11:39 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Stonehenge Health IP LLC served on 8/30/2024, answer due 9/20/2024. Service was accepted by Shane Johnson, Mail Manager. Document filed by Cedric Bishop..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 08/12 11:31 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stonehenge Health IP LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 10, 2024
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sat 08/10 1:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stonehenge Health IP LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Cedric Bishop..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sat 08/10 1:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 08/09 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: Initial Conference set for 12/6/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/9/2024) (tro)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/09 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Cedric Bishop..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/09 1:21 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael A. LaBollita. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 08/09 1:38 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 08/09 1:38 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 08/09 1:38 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/08 10:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Stonehenge Health IP LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29726770)Document filed by Cedric Bishop..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]