Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 2:24-cv-03783
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Re-opened:Dec 12, 2024
Terminated:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:51 AM EST
Defendant
LUCAS FRASER
Represented By
Christopher Andrew Thagard
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
KEVIN MONASTRA
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Isaac Jonathan Jean-Pierre
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Plaintiff
DAVID HATCHIGIAN
2414 TOWNSHIP LINE ROAD
HAVERTOWN, PA 19083


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 13, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 12/13 4:20 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED AS THERE IS NO COLORABLE BASIS ON WHICH PLAINTIFF CAN PREVAIL, RENDERING THIS REQUEST FUTILE; ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 12/13/24.12/13/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 12/13 8:10 AM
PRO SE PLAINTIFF DAVID HATCHIGIAN'S MOTION FOR A THIRTY (30) DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO APPLY FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THIS COURT'S ORDER DATED NOVEMBER 27, 2024 [ECF DOC 18 (FILED 11/27/24)] AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE..(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 11/27 4:32 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS OF THE UNITED STATES (DOC. NO. 15) AND DEFENDANT FRASER (DOC. NO. 9) ARE GRANTED. THIS MATTER IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 11/27/2024.11/27/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
17 17 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 11/18 2:34 PM
RESPONSE in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jean-Pierre, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/12 11:48 AM
PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S15 MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER PFCP.12(b)(1)(6) filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. Memorandum of Law. Proposed Order.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
Thursday, October 24, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss Thu 10/24 11:37 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(Jean-Pierre, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - First SF95,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Second SF95,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Payment of Claim,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Declaration
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Jonathan Jean-Pierre on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(Jean-Pierre, Isaac)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Andrew Thagard on behalf of LUCAS FRASER (Thagard, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/17 4:38 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LUCAS FRASER. (MONASTRA, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/09 11:23 AM
Plaintiff David Hatchigian's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Lucas Fraser's9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Certificate of Service.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Cover page
Friday, September 27, 2024
10 10 misc Affidavit Fri 09/27 11:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT Of Service by LUCAS FRASER. (MONASTRA, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 09/20 5:03 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LUCAS FRASER.Memorandum.(MONASTRA, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/13 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN MONASTRA on behalf of LUCAS FRASER (MONASTRA, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
7 7 service Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Tue 08/27 9:52 AM
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 08/19 1:52 PM
Summons Issued as to LUCAS FRASER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded To: Pro se Plaintiff on 8/19/2024. E-mailed to AUSA on 8/19/2024. (ahf)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 08/19 12:46 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number PPE22794 (rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
misc Remark Thu 08/15 7:58 AM
DOC. 4 AND NON PRISONER IFP MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF (rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order Wed 08/14 9:12 AM
ORDER THAT IF HATCHIGIAN AND RANDAZZO SEEK TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, THEY MUST, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1) PAY $405 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK SHALL PROVIDE PLAINTIFFS WITH TWO APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER. APPLICATIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF JOAN RANDAZZO SEEKS TO PROCEED AS A NAMED PLAINTIFF, SHE IS DIRECTED TO COMPLETE AND RETURN TO THE COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS THIS ORDER OF DECLARATION FORM ATTACHED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS ALONG WITH A COPY OF THE ATTACHED DECLARATION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 8/13/2024. 8/14/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. NOT EMAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
3 3 trial Exhibit Thu 08/08 4:24 PM
EXHIBIT filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN..(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover page
2 2 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Thu 08/08 11:02 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. (ahf)
Related: [-]
1 1 52 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/08 10:50 AM
COMPLAINT against LUCAS FRASER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (NO FEE PAID, NO IFP FILED).(ahf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Cover Page
misc Jury Demand Thu 08/08 11:03 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (ahf)
Related: [-]