Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-01330
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 09, 2024 12:43 AM MST
Defendant
Heather Lei Renee Manley (1)
Represented By
Kathy L Henry
Kathy Henry & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ross Gabriel Arellano Edwards
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Material Witness
Material Witness
Terminated: 07/19/2024
Represented By
Karina Janine Ordonez
Karina Ordonez Law Office PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/09/2024 2:19 AM MST
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
Arrest of Heather Lei Renee Manley on 7/10/2024. (MRH) [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Heather Lei Renee Manley. (MRH) [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT FOR DETENTION OF MATERIAL WITNESS by US Border Patrol Agent Samuel Maguire as to Heather Lei Renee Manley. (MRH) [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Initial Appearance as to Heather Lei Renee Manley held on 7/12/2024. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. Appointing Kathy L Henry for Defendant with Appointment Type: CJA. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Status Hearing set. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Chong-Ho Chung on behalf of Ross Arellano Edwards for the Government, CJA Attorney Kathy Henry for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Status Hearing re: Material Witness Video Depositions set for 7/19/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus. Related [+] Hearing held 3:45 PM to 3:49 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey.(KGM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Initial Appearance for Material Witness in case as to Heather Lei Renee Manley held on 7/12/2024. Material Witness is present and in custody. Appointing CJA Attorney Karina Ordonez for Material Witness. Material Witness is notified of the Status Hearing previously set before Judge Bachus on 7/19/2024, and her presence is waived by counsel. Order to issue. Appearances : AUSA Chong-Ho Chung on behalf of Ross Arellano Edwards for the Government, CJA Attorney Joseph Duarte on behalf of Karina Ordonez for Material Witness. Spanish Interpreter Ricardo Arenas assists Material Witness telephonically. Related [+] Hearing held 4:19 PM to 4:27 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Monday, July 15, 2024
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Heather Lei Renee Manley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 7/12/2024. (KGM) [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-]
8 8 MATERIAL WITNESS ORDER as to Heather Lei Renee Manley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 7/12/2024. (KGM) [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CR 23-00072 TUC-JJT as to Heather Lei Renee Manley. (BAC) [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
10 10 *MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus: Status Hearing re: Material Witness Video Depositions as to Heather Lei Renee Manley held on 7/19/2024. The presence of the Material Witness is waived for this proceeding. The Court accepts the Stipulation and signs the form of Order releasing the Material Witnesses to the Department of Homeland Security for return to their country of origin. Appearances : AUSA Ross Arellano-Edwards for the Government, CJA Attorney Kathy Henry for Defendant. CJA Attorney Karina Ordonez is present for the Material Witnesses. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 11:19 AM to 11:20 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AO) *Modified on 7/19/2024 to include CJA Ordonez is present for the Material Witness (AO). [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART
11 11 STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION FOR RELEASE OF MATERIAL WITNESSES as to Heather Lei Renee Manley. (AO) [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER as to Heather Lei Renee Manley: pursuant to11 Stipulation for Release of Material Witness, IT IS ORDERED directing the United States Marshal to release the Material Witness in this action to the Department of Homeland Security for return to their country of origin. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the order of separation between the Defendant and Material Witness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus on 7/19/2024. (AO) [2:24-mj-06228-ASB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
13 13 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Heather Lei Renee Manley (1) count(s) 1 with Forfeiture Allegation. Arraignment set for 8/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle. (KLG)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
14 14 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M Lanham. Filed by USA as to Heather Lei Renee Manley. (KLG)
Related: [-]
16 16 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Heather Lei Renee Manley. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summary