Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00909
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 09, 2024 2:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Diego Lechuga-Palacios (1)
Represented By
David Javier Lopez
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Melissa Andrea Lopez
Doj-Usao
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/09/2024 3:48 AM CDT
Friday, July 12, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 7/15/2024 at 09:35 AM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga (akp5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios, filed. (akp5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on July 12, 2024 at 11:48 AM as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (akp5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Diego Lechuga-Palacios added. (fv5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios held on 7/15/2024. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing filed. Appearances: Andrew Patrick Hakala-Finch AUSA; FPD Ariana Salinas (on duty); USPO: Brenda Cardenas; USM: Deputy Martinez. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:52 AM - 10:22 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Eduardo Canudas, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (fv5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Javier Lopez, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios, filed. (Lopez, David) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios, filed. Agent: Michael Grant (fv5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Diego Lechuga-Palacios, filed. (tat5). [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (fv5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (fv5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 7/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (fv5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios. Detention Hearing set for 7/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (fv5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant Diego Lechuga-Palacios, filed. (tat5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Diego Lechuga-Palacios, filed. (tat5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Melissa Andrea Lopez appearing for USA, filed. (Lopez, Melissa) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios: Prelim Exam and Detention Hrg terminated. (fv5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
12 12 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (fv5) [5:24-mj-00878]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
14 14 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Diego Lechuga-Palacios (1) count(s) 1, filed. (tat5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment