Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-20440
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 09, 2024 3:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Maurice Robinson, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Amanda N. Bashi
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Matthew A. Roth
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/09/2024 5:09 AM EDT
Thursday, August 01, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman as to Maurice Robinson, Jr (1). (DJen) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Initial Appearance as to Maurice Robinson, Jr held on 8/5/2024. Detention Hearing set for 8/6/2024 at 01:00 PM. Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Benton Martin) (AUSA: Raj Prasad) (DPer) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER WITH MOTION to Unseal 2 Arrest Warrant Issued,1 Criminal Complaint as to Maurice Robinson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DPer) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amanda N. Bashi appearing for Maurice Robinson, Jr (Bashi, Amanda) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Maurice Robinson, Jr held on 8/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.1 MB) (MCho) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Maurice Robinson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Maurice Robinson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Maurice Robinson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Detention Hearing as to Maurice Robinson, Jr held on 8/6/2024. Disposition: Defendant ordered detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Amanda Bashi) (AUSA: Matthew Roth) (DPer) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 Public Audio File of Detention Hearing as to Maurice Robinson, Jr held on 8/6/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. AUDIO FILE SIZE (14.4 MB) (MCho) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Maurice Robinson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DJen) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
11 11 Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 8/1/2024 as to Maurice Robinson, Jr. (JHea) [2:24-mj-30319-DUTY]
Related: [-]
13 13 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Maurice Robinson, Jr (1) count(s) 1. (TTho)
Related: [-]