Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant, III
Case #: 4:24-cv-00712
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 4:00 AM CST
Defendant
Cantex Continuing Care Network, LLC
Represented By
Jack Lawrence Oliver, III
Cantex Continuing Care Network
contact info
Nathan Flanigin
Cooper & Scully P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Plano Continuing Care Center Ltd. Co.
Represented By
Jack Lawrence Oliver, III
Cantex Continuing Care Network
contact info
Nathan Flanigin
Cooper & Scully P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Luke Motley, IV
lmotley4@motleypc.com Law Offices of Luke Motley, IV PC 207 S. Travis Suite 100
Sherman, TX 75090
Plaintiff
Cynthia Sanusi Jackson
Represented By
Ronald R Huff
Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 24, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 01/24 9:15 AM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceeding14 is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall submit to binding arbitration pursuant to her arbitration agreement. This case be STAYED pending the conclusion of arbitration proceedings.The Clerk is directed to CANCEL the September 4, 2025, Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/24/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/17 10:34 AM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses by Cynthia Sanusi Jackson (Huff, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
20 20 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Thu 01/02 11:58 AM
OPPOSED Proposed Pretrial Order Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Plano Continuing Care Center Ltd. Co.. (Oliver, Jack)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
19 19 respm Response to Motion Fri 12/06 1:35 PM
RESPONSE re14 FIRST MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Cynthia Sanusi Jackson . (Huff, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/27 12:24 PM
ORDER granting17 AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to14 FIRST MOTION to Compel. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings is due on December 6, 2024. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/27/2024. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 11/25 11:31 AM
AGREED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 FIRST MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Cynthia Sanusi Jackson.(Huff, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 18, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediator Mon 11/18 2:34 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. The Court hereby ORDERS that this case be submitted to mediation in accordance with this court's Mediation Plan. The mediator assigned is Luke Motley IV. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/18/2024. (rpc)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Mon 11/18 2:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2025 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2025. Discovery due by 4/25/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2024. Jury instructions due by 8/21/2025. Mediation Completion due by 3/7/2025. Motions due by 3/14/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2025. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/18/2024. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
14 14 motion Compel Fri 11/15 1:34 PM
FIRST MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Plano Continuing Care Center Ltd. Co..(Oliver, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s) Brief in Support of Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Arbitration Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Paycom,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Sonya Hicks Affidavit
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Wed 11/13 10:10 AM
FIRST NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Plano Continuing Care Center Ltd. Co. (Oliver, Jack)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
utility Remark Thu 10/31 4:42 PM
Due to the Court's patent hearing docket, the Court hereby CANCELS the November 8, 2024 Scheduling Conference; the Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (No attachment) (tls)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 10/25 2:40 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Huff, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Proposed Scheduling Order
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Tue 10/22 4:45 PM
FIRST NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Plano Continuing Care Center Ltd. Co. (Oliver, Jack)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Mon 10/21 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cynthia Sanusi Jackson Plaintiff's Notice That Initial Disclosure Has Taken Place (Huff, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
9 9 10 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Fri 09/20 5:11 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/25/2024. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 11/8/2024 at 10:30 AM in Video Conf Rm (Sherman) or Telephone before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/20/2024. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
8 8 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 09/03 2:52 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Plano Continuing Care Center Ltd. Co. (Oliver, Jack)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 09/03 2:50 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Cantex Continuing Care Network, LLC (Oliver, Jack)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/03 2:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Cantex Continuing Care Network, LLC, Plano Continuing Care Center Ltd. Co..(Oliver, Jack)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/16 1:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Sanusi Jackson. Plano Continuing Care Center Ltd. Co. served on 8/12/2024. (Huff, Ronald)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/16 1:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Sanusi Jackson. Cantex Continuing Care Network, LLC served on 8/12/2024. (Huff, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/09 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Plano Continuing Care Center Ltd. Co. (rpc)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 08/09 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Cantex Continuing Care Network, LLC. (rpc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/09 10:03 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10287910.), filed by Cynthia Sanusi Jackson.(Huff, Ronald) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/9/2024) (rpc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/09 10:46 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 08/09 10:46 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc)
Related: [-]