Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Case #: 1:24-cv-23027
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2024
Terminated:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 4:59 AM EST
Defendant
Mia Aesthetics Clinic, LLC.
Represented By
Joan Carlos Wizel
Llopiz Wizel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Windy Lucius
Represented By
Juan Courtney Cunningham
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, January 06, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Mon 01/06 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Tue 10/15 9:18 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
9 9 order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 09/30 5:33 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER staying and administratively closing case in light of8 Report to the Court on Agreement to Remediate Issues Identified in the Complaint. On or before October 15, 2024, Defendant shall confer with Plaintiff and file a notice confirming that the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint have been remediated, accompanied by a joint proposed order of dismissal attached to the notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/30/2024. (aci)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
8 8 misc Report Regarding Mon 09/23 7:40 PM
REPORT REGARDING Agreement to Remediate Issues Identified in the Complaint by Mia Aesthetics Clinic, LLC. (Wizel, Joan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 09/04 12:11 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before September 23, 2024, Defendant shall respond to the Complaint or file a report in compliance with the Court's Notice of Court Practice, [ECF No. 5]. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 9/4/2024. (aci)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Fri 09/06 10:19 AM
Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Mia Aesthetics Clinic, LLC. response/answer due 9/23/2024. PER DE#7 (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time Tue 09/03 4:02 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to file the report required by the Notice of Court Practice [ECF No. 5], and, if necessary, file a responsive pleading or motion to Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No. 1] re1 Complaint, 5 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,,,,, by Mia Aesthetics Clinic, LLC.. Attorney Joan Carlos Wizel added to party Mia Aesthetics Clinic, LLC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/17/2024.(Wizel, Joan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
5 5 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Wed 08/14 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. The Complaint in this action is filed under the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. §§ 12181 et seq. In order to assist the Court in the management of this case, and in an effort to foster an early and cost-effective resolution, the parties are ORDERED as follows: Within fourteen (14) days of service of the Complaint, Defendant shall file a report with the Court indicating whether it agrees to (1) remediate the deficiencies identified in the Complaint, (2) entry of an injunction to ensure future compliance, and (3) pay Plaintiff's reasonable attorney's fees and costs, as determined by the Court or agreement by the parties. If so, Defendant shall include a reasonable timeline for remediation. If, upon review of the report, the Court finds that Defendant intends to remediate the property within a reasonable time, the action shall be stayed. If requested, the Court may grant proportional discovery to verify Defendant's remediation of the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint. After receiving notice from the parties that the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint have been remediated, the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed order of dismissal, including an injunction for future compliance and an award of reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Disputes will be resolved by the Court. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/14/2024. (aci)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 08/14 10:08 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Windy Lucius. Mia Aesthetics Clinic, LLC. served on 8/12/2024, response/answer due 9/3/2024. (Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/09 12:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Mia Aesthetics Clinic, LLC.. (gqa)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 08/09 12:42 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/09 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT against Mia Aesthetics Clinic, LLC.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17745405, filed by Windy Lucius.(Cunningham, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)