Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Douglas R Cole
Case #: 1:24-cv-00422
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:36 AM EST
Defendant
Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.
4773 Bethany Road
Mason, OH 45040
Represented By
Jeremy David Smith
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Jonathan D Lotsoff
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Hannah B. Fisher
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Eric L. Mackie
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Allison Louise Goico
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Thomas
Represented By
Joseph Corey Asay
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
27 27 motion Settlement Fri 04/25 2:41 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Plaintiff Jason Thomas. (Asay, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
26 26 motion Leave to File Document Fri 04/25 2:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Jason Thomas. (Asay, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/22 3:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., filed by Jason Thomas. (Asay, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/17 9:44 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time extending the deadline to submit the Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval and related filings to April 25, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 4/17/25. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/16 7:04 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/25/2025. Joint Motion for Extension of Time Re Prelim Settlement Filings by Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Lotsoff, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Joint Motion for Extension of Time
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 03/25 9:46 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting23 Joint Motion for Extension of Time extending the deadline to submit the Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval to April 16, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/25/25. (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 03/24 12:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 4/16/2025. Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Parties Class and Collective Action Settlement by Plaintiff Jason Thomas. (Asay, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 13, 2025
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 03/13 10:49 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting22 Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance as Attorney. Attorney Eric L. Mackie terminated from the docket in this matter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/13/25. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/12 4:25 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ERIC L. MACKIE by Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Lotsoff, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Status Report Wed 03/12 3:47 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT FILING by Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Lotsoff, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
20 20 18 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 01/03 3:26 PM
STIPULATED MEDIATION PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 1/3/25. (sct)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
19 19 motion Protective Order Mon 12/30 2:40 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order to Enter Stipulated Mediation by Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Smith, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Agreed Mediation Protective Order
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 11/05 11:34 AM
ORDER granting17 Parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement Discussions.Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 11/4/24. (sct) Modified Signature Date to Match Document on 11/5/2024 (bjc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
17 17 motion Stay Fri 11/01 4:31 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement Discussions by Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Smith, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement Discussions
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/24 4:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi Electric US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc. for Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc... (Goico, Allison)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/24 4:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Goico, Allison)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/24 11:19 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10178120) of Jonathan D. Lotsoff by Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Goico, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit #1 - Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois - Jonathan D. Lotsoff,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jonathan D. Lotsoff
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/24 1:52 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan D. Lotsoff. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/24/2024. (kev)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/10 12:16 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric L. Mackie as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for efiling through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/10/2024. (kh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
13 13 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/09 7:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10156239) of Eric L. Mackie by Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Goico, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois Eric L. Mackie,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Eric L. Mackie
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/09 12:50 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Jason Thomas (Asay, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim for Alison Ernst,
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim for Stacey Robinson
Friday, September 06, 2024
11 11 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/06 12:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10152832) of Hannah B. Fisher by Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Goico, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois - Hannah Brittany Fisher,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Hannah B. Fisher
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/06 2:30 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah B. Fisher as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for efiling through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 9/6/2024. (kh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 09/03 9:52 AM
Reset Deadlines per9 Stipulation for Extension of Time: Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc. answer due 9/24/2024. (kev)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/30 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Smith for Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc. (Smith, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 08/30 2:21 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc.. (Goico, Allison)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/30 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Louise Goico for Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc. (Goico, Allison)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/23 1:06 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Jason Thomas of Filing Opt-In Consent Forms (Asay, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim for Dominique Brown,
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim for Paul Latham
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/20 12:22 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Jason Thomas (Asay, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim for Jody Hord,
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim for Van Cunningham,
Att: 3 Exhibit Consent to Join for LaRon Ellick
Thursday, August 15, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/15 3:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint to CT Corporation Registered Agent served on Jeanne Lane on 8/13/2024, filed by Plaintiff Jason Thomas. (Asay, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 08/09 3:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc. (kev)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Docket Annotation Fri 08/09 3:11 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (kev)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/09 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Corey Asay for Plaintiff Jason Thomas (Asay, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/09 1:06 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Mitsubishi Electric Automotive America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10108880), filed by Jason Thomas. (Asay, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit A Consent to Join