California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:24-cv-06759
Nature of Suit891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts
Cause07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2024
Re-opened:May 07, 2025
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 2:02 AM PST
Defendant
BHTT Holdings, LLC
Defendant
C Jumper Restaurants, Inc.
Defendant
Claim Jumper Acquisition Company, LLC
Defendant
Del Mar Group, LLC
Defendant
KRG BHTT, LLC
Defendant
KRG Claim Jumper, LLC
Defendant
KRG JCS Redondo Beach, LLC
Defendant
Michael R Kelly
Defendant
Kelly Investment Group, LLC
Defendant
Kelly Operations Group, LLC
Defendant
Claim Jumper Restaurant Sacramento, LLC
Defendant
Kelly Companies of Southern California, LLC
Plaintiff
L.A. Specialty Produce Co.
Represented By
Elise Charlotte O'Brien
Fennemore Craig, P.C.
contact info
June T Monroe
Fennemore Craig, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
32 32 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Case Reopened Wed 05/07 9:25 AM
[In Chambers] ORDER REOPENING CASE and ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST MICHAEL R. KELLY SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: The Court therefore ORDERS the Clerk's Office to reopen this case so that the claims against Kelly may be addressed. Plaintiff must respond within 10 days of this order, or the claims against Michael R. Kelly will be dismissed without further notice. [See document for additional information.] (Case reopened. MD JS-5.) (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
31 31 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/21 12:10 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN THE EVENT OF DEFAULT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, re Stipulation for Judgment30 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation is approved in its entirety and the Stipulated Facts therein are adopted by this Court as Findings of Fact; IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter pursuant to Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins., 511 U.S. 375 (1994) as it relates to Plaintiff's claims against Corporate Defendants to enforce the settlement agreement between the Plaintiff and Corporate Defendants as well as all orders entered by the Court in this matter, which orders shall retain their enforceability; IT HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to the Corporate Defendants only, subject to reopening in the event of the Corporate Defendants' default. In addition, in the event of default by the Corporate Defendants, Vesta reserves all claims and remedies against Individual Defendant and the Individual Defendant reserves all defenses. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
30 30 stip Judgment Wed 04/09 12:08 PM
STIPULATION for Judgment as to Defendants Claim Jumper Acquisition Company, LLC dba Claim Jumper Steakhouse & Bar; KRG Claim Jumper, LLC; Del Mar Group, LLC; BHTT Holdings, LLC; Claim Jumper Restaurant (Sacramento), LLC; KRG JCS Redondo Beach, LLC; KRG BHTT, LLC; C Jumper Restaurants, Inc.; Kelly Operations Group, LLC; Kelly Companies of Southern California, LLC; Kelly Investment Group, LLC and Michael R. Kelly filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co..(Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - (Proposed) Judgment,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation for Entry of Judgment in the Event of Default
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
29 29 notice Settlement Wed 04/02 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co.. (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
28 28 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Sat 03/22 11:13 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before 4/2/2025, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. This matter will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
27 27 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 01/24 9:33 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Kelly Investment Group, LLC and Michael R. Kelly. (gk)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 01/24 9:32 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to KRG JCS Redondo Beach, LLC, KRG BHTT, LLC, C Jumper Restaurants, Inc., Kelly Operations Group, LLC, and Kelly Companies of Southern California, LLC. (gk)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 01/24 9:23 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Claim Jumper Acquisition Company, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, dba Claim Jumper Steakhouse & Bar, KRG Claim Jumper, LLC, Del Mar Group, LLC, BLTT Holdings, LLC, and Claim Jumper Restaurant (Sacramento), LLC. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
24 24 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/23 8:34 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On 1/7/2025, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has filed a response to the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution on 1/21/2025. The Court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
23 23 motion Clerk to Enter Default Tue 01/21 6:00 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants BHTT Holdings, LLC, C Jumper Restaurants, Inc., Claim Jumper Acquisition Company, LLC, Claim Jumper Restaurant Sacramento, LLC, Del Mar Group, LLC, KRG BHTT, LLC, KRG Claim Jumper, LLC, KRG JCS Redondo Beach, LLC, Michael R Kelly, Kelly Companies of Southern California, LLC, Kelly Investment Group, LLC, Kelly Operations Group, LLC filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co.. (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
22 22 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/07 8:51 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause, in writing, on or before 1/21/2025, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. This matter will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
21 21 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 09/04 3:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant Michael R Kelly served on 8/26/2024, answer due 9/16/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, person in charge of business of person served in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
20 20 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 08/27 10:01 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant KRG JCS Redondo Beach, LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Kosters, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 08/27 9:58 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant KRG Claim Jumper, LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Kosters, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 08/27 9:55 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant KRG BHTT, LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Kosters, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 08/27 9:53 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant Kelly Operations Group, LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Kosters, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 08/27 9:49 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant Kelly Investment Group, LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Kosters, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 08/27 9:47 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant Kelly Companies of Southern California, LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Kosters, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 08/27 9:44 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant Del Mar Group, LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Kosters, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 08/27 9:42 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant Claim Jumper Restaurant Sacramento, LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Kosters, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 08/27 9:39 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant Claim Jumper Acquisition Company, LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Kosters, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 08/27 9:36 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant C Jumper Restaurants, Inc. served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Kosters, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 08/27 9:19 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., upon Defendant BHTT Holdings, LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Luke Kosters, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 08/13 11:23 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 08/12 9:11 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants BHTT Holdings, LLC, C Jumper Restaurants, Inc., Claim Jumper Acquisition Company, LLC, Claim Jumper Restaurant Sacramento, LLC, Del Mar Group, LLC, KRG BHTT, LLC, KRG Claim Jumper, LLC, KRG JCS Redondo Beach, LLC, Michael R Kelly, Kelly Companies of Southern California, LLC, Kelly Investment Group, LLC, Kelly Operations Group, LLC. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 08/12 3:45 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 08/12 3:44 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 08/12 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 08/09 3:35 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co.. (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 08/09 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co., (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 08/09 1:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co.. (Monroe, June)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 08/09 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37997584 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff L.A. Specialty Produce Co.. (Attorney June T Monroe added to party L.A. Specialty Produce Co.(pty:pla))(Monroe, June)
Related: [-]