Washington Western District Court
Judge:Thomas S Zilly
Case #: 2:24-cv-01220
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 24-00002-14131-6 KNT
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 2:45 AM PST
Defendant
Michaels Stores Inc
Represented By
April L. Upchurch Fredrickson
Miller Nash Llp (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Dawn McClaflin
Represented By
Hugh Joseph McGavick
Law Office Of Hugh J Mcgavick Ps
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/17 1:20 PM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) re9 Proposed Order. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
9 9 misc Proposed Order (Unsigned) Thu 03/13 3:19 PM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) of Dismissal (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
8 8 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 08/20 2:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Parties' stipulated motion to compel arbitration and stay the case, docket no.5 , is GRANTED. The Parties are ORDERED to submit all claims in this lawsuit to binding non-judicial arbitration pursuant to the terms of the Parties' arbitration agreement. The case is STAYED pending the resolution of the Parties' arbitration. The Parties are DIRECTED to file a joint status report within fourteen (14) days of the resolution of their arbitration or by July 31, 2025, whichever occurs sooner, indicating the status of the case and any remaining claims. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
7 7 respm Declaration Fri 08/16 3:33 PM
DECLARATION of April Upchurch Fredrickson filed by Defendant Michaels Stores Inc re6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer(Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/16 3:32 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Michaels Stores Inc. Noting Date 8/16/2024, (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Compel Fri 08/16 3:09 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Request to Stay Proceedings , filed by Defendant Michaels Stores Inc. Noting Date 8/16/2024, (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Terminate Motions (Public) Fri 08/16 4:44 PM
Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file response to complaint, docket no.6 , is GRANTED. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than September 16, 2024. (AJZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
4 4 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Thu 08/15 10:38 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 08/15 10:32 AM
Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
3 3 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 08/09 2:39 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Michaels Companies, Inc. for Michaels Stores, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Fri 08/09 2:24 PM
DECLARATION of Christopher D. Lopez-Loftis re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 08/09 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 24 2-14131 6 KNT; Related [+] Attorney April L. Upchurch Fredrickson added to party Michaels Stores, Inc.(pty:dft) filed by Michaels Stores, Inc..(Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8580952
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet