Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Case #: 1:24-cv-02306
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Terminated:Sep 26, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 4:55 AM EST
Petitioner
Terrance Lee Murphy
United States republic Maryland territory 1014 Pope Avenue
Hagerstown, MD 21740
Respondent
Washington County Circuit Court

GPO Sep 26 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 9/25/2024. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, September 26, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/26 11:05 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DISMISSING the Complaint w/out prejudice; DIRECTING Clerk to Close case. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 9/25/2024. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Thu 09/26 10:59 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 9/25/2024. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/13 3:12 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (bljs)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
3 3 misc New Case Notification Letter Fri 08/09 4:36 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Terrance Lee Murphy. (c/m 8/9/24- ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/09 4:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrance Lee Murphy(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/09 4:33 PM
PETITION for Writ of Certiorari, filed by Terrance Lee Murphy.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Attachment,
Att: 3 Attachment