Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:John R Adams
Case #: 5:24-cv-01359
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Cause28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Terminated:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:03 AM EST
Petitioner
Coalition of Concerned Voters of Ohio
P.O. Box 99
Dublin, OH 43017
Represented By
Bruce L Castor
Thomas A. Will & Associates
contact info
R. Aaron Miller
R. Aaron Miller Law Office
contact info
Bruce L. Castor, III
Law Office Of Thomas A. Will - Canonsburg
contact info
Petitioner
Joseph Healy
Represented By
Bruce L. Castor, III
Law Office Of Thomas A. Will - Canonsburg
contact info
Petitioner
Mary Ann Brej
Represented By
Bruce L. Castor, III
Law Office Of Thomas A. Will - Canonsburg
contact info
Petitioner
United Sovereign Americans, Inc.
Represented By
Bruce L Castor
Thomas A. Will & Associates
contact info
R. Aaron Miller
R. Aaron Miller Law Office
contact info
Bruce L. Castor, III
Law Office Of Thomas A. Will - Canonsburg
contact info
Petitioner
James Rigano
8786 Wildwood Place
Springboro, OH 45066
Represented By
Bruce L Castor
Thomas A. Will & Associates
contact info
R. Aaron Miller
R. Aaron Miller Law Office
contact info
Bruce L. Castor, III
Law Office Of Thomas A. Will - Canonsburg
contact info
Petitioner
Carrie Perkins
3790 White Oak Lane
Wooster, OH 44691
Represented By
Bruce L Castor
Thomas A. Will & Associates
contact info
R. Aaron Miller
R. Aaron Miller Law Office
contact info
Bruce L. Castor, III
Law Office Of Thomas A. Will - Canonsburg
contact info
Petitioner
Jacqueline Loughman
1213 Maryland Avenue SW
Canton, OH 44710
Represented By
Bruce L Castor
Thomas A. Will & Associates
contact info
R. Aaron Miller
R. Aaron Miller Law Office
contact info
Bruce L. Castor, III
Law Office Of Thomas A. Will - Canonsburg
contact info
Respondent
Dave Yost
In his Offical Capacity as Attorney General of Ohio 14th Floor Rhodes State Office Tower 30 East Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Heather L. Buchanan
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Stephen P. Tabatowski
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Mark D. Tucker
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Ann Yackshaw
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Respondent
Frank LaRose
In his Official Capacity as the Ohio Secretary of State 180 Civic Center Drive
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Heather L. Buchanan
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Stephen P. Tabatowski
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Mark D. Tucker
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Ann Yackshaw
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Respondent
Merrick Garland
In his Official Capacity as Attorney General of the United States 950 Pensylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20530
Represented By
Karen E. Swanson-Haan
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Respondent
Ohio Board of Voting Machine Examiners
Terminated: 09/05/2024
180 Civic Center Drive
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Heather L. Buchanan
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Stephen P. Tabatowski
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Mark D. Tucker
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Ann Yackshaw
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Respondent
Ohio Office of Data Analytics and Archives
Terminated: 09/05/2024
180 Civic Center Drive
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Heather L. Buchanan
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Stephen P. Tabatowski
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Mark D. Tucker
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Ann Yackshaw
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Respondent
Ohio Attorney General's Office
Terminated: 09/05/2024
Represented By
Heather L. Buchanan
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Stephen P. Tabatowski
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Mark D. Tucker
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Ann Yackshaw
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Respondent
Office of The Ohio Secretary of State
Terminated: 09/05/2024
180 Civic Center Drive
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Heather L. Buchanan
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Stephen P. Tabatowski
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Mark D. Tucker
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Ann Yackshaw
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Respondent
State of Ohio
Terminated: 09/05/2024
180 Civic Center Drive
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Heather L. Buchanan
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Stephen P. Tabatowski
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Mark D. Tucker
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Ann Yackshaw
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Respondent
United States Department of Justice
Terminated: 09/05/2024


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/09 11:53 AM
Marginal Entry Order dismissing this matter without prejudice upon notice from Petitioners of voluntary dismissal. Judge John R. Adams on 5/9/25. (K,C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 05/06 5:00 PM
Consent Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) Without Prejudice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Castor, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
22 22 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Order and Notice of Party Dismissal Tue 03/18 8:12 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting Petitioners' uncontested motion to dismiss party Carrie Perkins (Doc. #21 ). Petitioner Carrie Perkins is dismissed from this matter. Judge John R. Adams on 3/17/25. (K,C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
21 21 motion Dismiss Party Wed 01/22 12:17 PM
Unopposed Motion to dismiss party Carrie Perkins filed by Petitioner Carrie Perkins. (Castor, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
20 20 resp Reply Mon 12/30 1:51 PM
Reply in support of16 Motion to dismiss Amended Petition for lack of jurisdiction filed by Merrick Garland. (Swanson-Haan, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Thu 12/19 10:49 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting18 Respondent Garland's Motion for Extension of Time to File reply. Reply now due 12/31/2024. Judge John R. Adams on 12/19/2024.(L,J)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Thu 12/19 10:03 AM
Motion for extension of time until December 31, 2024 to file response/reply to16 Motion to dismiss Amended Petition for lack of jurisdiction filed by Respondent Merrick Garland. Related document(s)16 . (Swanson-Haan, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
17 17 resp Opposition Wed 12/11 4:06 PM
Opposition to16 Motion to dismiss Amended Petition for lack of jurisdiction filed by United Sovereign Americans, Inc., Coalition of Concerned Voters of Ohio, James Rigano, Carrie Perkins, Jacqueline Loughman, Joseph Healy, Mary Ann Brej. (Castor, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 11/14 3:51 PM
Motion to dismiss Amended Petition for lack of jurisdiction filed by Respondent Merrick Garland. (Swanson-Haan, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Monday, October 28, 2024
15 15 resp Reply Mon 10/28 1:53 PM
Reply in support of13 Motion to dismiss Amended Complaint for lack of jurisdiction filed by Frank LaRose, Office of The Ohio Secretary of State, Ohio Attorney General's Office, Dave Yost. (Tabatowski, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
14 14 resp Opposition Mon 10/14 6:43 PM
Opposition to13 Motion to dismiss Amended Complaint for lack of jurisdiction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Castor, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 09/13 3:12 PM
Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Amended Complaint filed by Frank LaRose, Office of The Ohio Secretary of State, Ohio Attorney General's Office, State of Ohio, Dave Yost. Related document(s)12 . (Yackshaw, Ann)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/05 11:24 AM
Amended complaint for relief in the form of a writ of mandamus against Merrick Garland, Frank LaRose, Office of The Ohio Secretary of State, Ohio Attorney General's Office, Ohio Board of Voting Machine Examiners, Ohio Office of Data Analytics and Archives, State of Ohio, United States Department of Justice, Dave Yost and adding new party plaintiff(s) Joseph Healy and Mary Ann Brej. Filed by James Rigano, Coalition of Concerned Voters of Ohio, Carrie Perkins, United Sovereign Americans, Inc., Jacqueline Loughman. (Castor, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit CCVO Correspondence to Wood County Board of Elections,
Att: 2 Exhibit CCVO Correspondence to Secretary LaRose,
Att: 3 Exhibit James Rigano Efforts to Improve Election Integrity,
Att: 4 Exhibit Carrie Perkins Unofficial Election Summary Report,
Att: 5 Exhibit Carrie Perkins Official Election Summary Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit United Sovereign Americans Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit Correspondence from Office of Secretary of State to Thomas Wood,
Att: 8 Exhibit SQL Database Queries,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ohio 2022 General Election Validity Scorecard,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ohio 2022 General Election Validity Reconciliation,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ohio 2022 General Election County-by-County Breakdown
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
11 11 service Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant Wed 08/28 4:02 PM
Return of Service by certified mail (Unsigned) executed upon Merrick Garland (US Attorney Northern District of Ohio) on 8/22/2024; United States Department of Justice (US Attorney Northern District of Ohio) on 8/22/2024 filed on behalf of James Rigano; Coalition of Concerned Voters of Ohio; Carrie Perkins; United Sovereign Americans, Inc.; Jacqueline Loughman Related document(s)2 . (M,Do)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Return of Service Executed Wed 08/28 3:36 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Dave Yost on 8/16/2024, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of James Rigano; Coalition of Concerned Voters of Ohio; Carrie Perkins; United Sovereign Americans, Inc.; Jacqueline Loughman Related document(s)2 . (M,Do)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Mon 08/26 3:18 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Ohio Attorney General's Office on 8/16/2024, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of James Rigano; Coalition of Concerned Voters of Ohio; Carrie Perkins; United Sovereign Americans, Inc.; Jacqueline Loughman Related document(s)2 . (M,Do)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Thu 08/22 3:03 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Office of The Ohio Secretary of State on 8/19/2024; Ohio Board of Voting Machine Examiners on 8/19/2024; Ohio Office of Data Analytics and Archives on 8/19/2024, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of James Rigano; Coalition of Concerned Voters of Ohio; Carrie Perkins; United Sovereign Americans, Inc.; Jacqueline Loughman Related document(s)2 . (M,Do)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 08/21 11:32 AM
Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Tucker filed by on behalf of Frank LaRose, Office of The Ohio Secretary of State, Ohio Attorney General's Office, Ohio Board of Voting Machine Examiners, Ohio Office of Data Analytics and Archives, State of Ohio, Dave Yost. (Tucker, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 08/21 11:31 AM
Attorney Appearance by Heather L. Buchanan filed by on behalf of Frank LaRose, Office of The Ohio Secretary of State, Ohio Attorney General's Office, Ohio Board of Voting Machine Examiners, Ohio Office of Data Analytics and Archives, State of Ohio, Dave Yost. (Buchanan, Heather)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 08/21 11:30 AM
Attorney Appearance by Ann Yackshaw filed by on behalf of Frank LaRose, Office of The Ohio Secretary of State, Ohio Attorney General's Office, Ohio Board of Voting Machine Examiners, Ohio Office of Data Analytics and Archives, State of Ohio, Dave Yost. (Yackshaw, Ann)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 08/21 11:28 AM
Attorney Appearance by Stephen P. Tabatowski filed by on behalf of Frank LaRose, Office of The Ohio Secretary of State, Ohio Attorney General's Office, Ohio Board of Voting Machine Examiners, Ohio Office of Data Analytics and Archives, State of Ohio, Dave Yost. (Tabatowski, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Mon 08/19 3:54 PM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Frank LaRose on 8/16/2024; State of Ohio on 8/16/2024, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf ofJames Rigano; Coalition of Concerned Voters of Ohio; Carrie Perkins; United Sovereign Americans, Inc.; Jacqueline Loughman Related document(s)2 . (M,Do)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
oth_evt Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Mon 08/12 9:52 AM
Notice to Attorney Bruce L. Castor III. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/09 10:59 AM
Petition for Relief in the form of a Writ of Mandamus against Merrick Garland, Frank LaRose, Office of The Ohio Secretary of State, Ohio Attorney Generals Office, Ohio Board of Voting Machine Examiners, Ohio Office of Data Analytics and Archives, State of Ohio, The United States Department of Justice, Dave Yost. Filing fee paid. $405.00. Receipt # 6787. Filed by James Rigano, Coalition of Concerned Voters of Ohio, Carrie Perkins, United Sovereign Americans, INC., Jacqueline Loughman. (M,Do)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Email exchanges and summary from Coalition of Concerned Voters of Ohio To Wood County Board of Elections,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Letter from Coalition of Concerned Voters of Ohio To Frank LaRose,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 J. Rigao Requests,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 Election Summary Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 Election Summary Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 Ohio Election Complaint,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 Email to Thomas Woods From Josh Jaffe,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 Ohio's 2022 Election Validity Scorecard,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 Ohio 2022 General Election Validity Scorecard,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 Ohio's 2022 General Election Validity Reconciliation,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 Registration Violations
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 08/09 11:02 AM
Judge John R. Adams assigned to case (M,Do)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 08/09 11:04 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (M,Do)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 08/09 11:19 AM
Original Summons issued to Counsel at Intake Counter for service upon Merrick Garland, Frank LaRose, Office of The Ohio Secretary of State, Ohio Attorney General's Office, Ohio Board of Voting Machine Examiners, Ohio Office of Data Analytics and Archives, State of Ohio, United States Department of Justice, Dave Yost. (M,Do)
Related: [-]