Morris et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04354 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Nevada, 2:24-cv-01292 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:27 AM EST |
Defendant
Narcote LLC
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Fire Protection Limited Partnership
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde P.l.c., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
ROE Corporations 1 through 20, inclusive
|
|
Defendant
RTX Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Ansul Company
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products Limited Partnership
|
|
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Chemical Operations LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas LLC
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EIDP Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 20
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
KAYLIE SUE MORRIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CODY MORRIS
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Asahikasei Plastics America, Inc.
Terminated: 10/02/2024
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CODY MORRIS, KAYLIE SUE MORRIS Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-04354-RMG(Entsminger, Erica) |
|
Monday, February 03, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Change of Address by Erica Entsminger Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-04354-RMG, 2:24-cv-04355-RMG, 2:24-cv-04356-RMG, 2:24-cv-05020-RMG(Entsminger, Erica) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Entry Deletion
Thu 10/03 11:33 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 9 Reason: Attorney filing user misfiled. Corrected Filing Document Number11 Filing date is that of original filing: 10/2/2024 (sshe, ) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Entry Deletion
Thu 10/03 11:10 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 8 Reason: Attorney filing user misfiled event type Filing date of original filing: 10/2/2024 QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: please reference CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 at ECF 486 (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) for instructions to properly file Certificate of Service event for any proofs of service document(s). (All answer due deadlines deleted) (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CODY MORRIS, KAYLIE SUE MORRIS Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of All Claims Against Asahi Kasei Plastics America, Inc., Only, Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Entsminger, Erica) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-04354-RMG QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: Please note correct filing procedures for future filings . Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case and spread to applicable member case(s) as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1. (sshe, ) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CODY MORRIS, KAYLIE SUE MORRIS Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of All Claims Against Asahi Kasei Plastics America, Inc., Only, Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Entsminger, Erica) |
|
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by KAYLIE SUE MORRIS, CODY MORRIS. 3M Chemical Operations LLC served on 8/30/2024, answer due 9/20/2024; 3M Company served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; AGC Chemicals Americas Inc served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Amerex Corporation served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024; Archroma US Inc served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024; Arkema Inc served on 9/3/2024, answer due 9/24/2024; Asahikasei Plastics America, Inc. served on 9/3/2024, answer due 9/24/2024; BASF Corporation served on 8/30/2024, answer due 9/20/2024; Buckeye Fire Equipment Company served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Carrier Fire & Security Americas LLC served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Carrier Fire & Security Corporation served on 9/5/2024, answer due 9/26/2024; Carrier Global Corporation served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; ChemDesign Products Inc served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Chemguard Inc served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Chemicals Incorporated served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Clariant Corporation served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024; Corteva Inc served on 8/30/2024, answer due 9/20/2024; Deepwater Chemicals Inc served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Dupont De Nemours Inc served on 8/30/2024, answer due 9/20/2024; Dynax Corporation served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; EIDP Inc served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Fire-Dex Inc served on 9/5/2024, answer due 9/26/2024; Fire-Dex LLC served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024; Globe Manufacturing Company LLC served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024; Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP served on 9/6/2024, answer due 9/27/2024; Johnson Controls Fire Protection Limited Partnership served on 9/6/2024, answer due 9/27/2024; Johnson Controls Inc served on 9/6/2024, answer due 9/27/2024; Kidde P.l.c., Inc. served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Kidde-Fenwal Inc served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Lion Group Inc served on 9/3/2024, answer due 9/24/2024; MSA Safety Incorporated served on 9/5/2024, answer due 9/26/2024; Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Narcote LLC served on 8/30/2024, answer due 9/20/2024; Nation Ford Chemical Company served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; National Foam Inc served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; PBI Performance Products Inc served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024; RTX Corporation served on 8/30/2024, answer due 9/20/2024; Southern Mills Inc served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; The Ansul Company served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; The Chemours Company served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Tyco Fire Products Limited Partnership served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; WL Gore & Associates Inc served on 8/30/2024, answer due 9/20/2024. (Entsminger, Erica) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 08/09 1:54 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Nevada, 2:24-cv-01292, Morris et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-4354-RMG (jbin) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:24-cv-01292. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 TRANSMITTAL of case to the District of South Carolina. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (AMMi - Ad hoc: D-SC) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/9/2024.] | |
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (ALZ) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/9/2024.] |