Iowa Southern District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00374
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Terminated:Aug 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2024 2:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Philip Colt Moss (1)
Represented By
Nova Danielle Janssen
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Mackenzi Nash
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mikaela J. Shotwell
United States Attorney'S Office - Dsm
contact info
MacKenzie Benson Tubbs
United States Attorney'S Office - Dsm
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/24/2025 4:20 PM CDT
Thursday, August 08, 2024
Arrest (Rule 5.c.3) of Philip Colt Moss from charges pending in District of Southern District of Ohio. (mrc)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Philip Colt Moss from the Southern District of Ohio. (mrc)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant received from Southern District of Ohio as to Philip Colt Moss. (mrc)
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ORDER as to Philip Colt Moss. Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3) set for 8/8/2024 01:30 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 8/8/2024. (mrc)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Philip Colt Moss held on 8/8/2024. Detention and Identity Hearing set for 8/13/2024 at 02:00 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. (Court Reporter Kelli Mulcahy.) (kmp)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL as to Philip Colt Moss. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 8/8/2024. (kmp)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs RULE 5 ORDER as to Philip Colt Moss. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 8/8/2024. (kmp)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Philip Colt Moss. (kmp)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING IDENTITY AND DETENTION HEARING as to Philip Colt Moss. Identity and Detention Hearing set for 8/13/2024 at 02:00 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 8/8/2024. (kmp)
Related: [-]