California Northern District Court
Judge:Eumi K Lee
Case #: 5:24-cv-05002
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 2:35 AM PST
Defendant
City of Sunnyvale
Represented By
Todd Holton Master
Ridley Master
contact info
Defendant
Jordan A. Oryall, Jr.
Represented By
Todd Holton Master
Ridley Master
contact info
Plaintiff
Josue Torres
Represented By
Donald Cloyce Wagda
Donald Wagda
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
27 27 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 04/23 4:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Settlement Conference held on 4/23/2025. (ccf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2025)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
26 26 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 04/18 12:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE to All Parties Regarding Settlement Conference: Please take notice that the Settlement Conference set for 4/23/2025 at 10:00 AM will take place in Courtroom 2 on the 4th Floor located at 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ccf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order Mon 01/27 12:30 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEET AND CONFER ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/27/2025. (klh, COURT STAFF) Modified on 1/27/2025 (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
24 24 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/27 9:32 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference held on 1/23/2025. Settlement Conference set for 4/23/2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Oakland, - To be determined. Confidential settlement conference statements are due on 4/14/2025. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Courts settlement conference standing order available at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/westmore-kandis-a-kaw/. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2025)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
23 23 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Telephone Conference Fri 11/22 10:47 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. Telephone Conference set for 1/23/2025 03:00 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Telephone Conference Fri 11/22 10:45 AM
***ORDER PROCESSED IN ERROR PLEASE SEE23 FOR CORRECTED ORDER*** CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. Telephone Conference set for 1/23/2024 03:00 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (wft, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/22/2024 (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 11/21 10:57 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . INTERESTED ENTITIES - NAME NOT ENTERED [err102] Names of interested entities or person MUST be entered at the prompt. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: 18 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Josue Torres (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Thu 11/21 4:54 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Settlement. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
21 21 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Wed 11/20 6:01 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Settlement Per the parties' request at the November 20, 2024 case management conference, the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for a settlement conference at a time and date determined by the Magistrate Judge and the parties. ADR L.R. 7-2. The settlement conference shall be held no later than April 30, 2025, or as soon thereafter as is convenient for Magistrate Judge Westmore. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee on 11/20/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Wed 11/20 5:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eumi K Lee: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/20/2024. Case Management Order entered at 19 . The court will refer the matter to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore to conduct a settlement conference by April 30, 2025. Separate order to issue. Total Time in Court: 1:34PM-1:40PM (6 minutes). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Donald Wagda. Defendant Attorney: Todd Master. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/20/2024)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 11/20 5:01 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT & SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee on 11/20/2024. (lrt, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 11/20 12:46 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Josue Torres (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 11/07 8:47 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING and NOTICE OF REQUIRED REGISTRATION. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Eumi K. Lee. (No time or date change.) This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting. Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at eklcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 18, 2024 at 5:00 PM PT. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (lrt, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
16 16 misc Joint Case Management Statement Wed 11/06 5:08 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Josue Torres. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
15 15 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 10/29 9:01 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
14 14 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 10/22 9:21 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Master, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 10/21 9:26 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by City of Sunnyvale, Jordan A. Oryall, Jr. (Master, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/07 11:58 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Damages for Violation of Civil Rights against All Defendants. Filed by Josue Torres.(Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Redline v. Original Complaint
Monday, September 16, 2024
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/16 9:09 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Sunnyvale, Jordan A. Oryall, Jr.. (Master, Todd)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/16 9:06 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by City of Sunnyvale, Jordan A. Oryall, Jr. (Master, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 08/28 12:46 PM
CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2024. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/20/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Eumi K. Lee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/28/2024 to correct time. (lrt, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/28 10:47 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Eumi K Lee for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 08/28 9:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/28 1:29 PM
Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2024 at 01:30 PM . (lrt, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 08/27 6:49 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Josue Torres.. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 08/13 11:49 AM
Summons Issued as to City of Sunnyvale, Jordan A. Oryall, Jr. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Mon 08/12 1:23 PM
Proposed Summons. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 08/12 10:59 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2024 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 08/12 9:57 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2024. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/09 11:53 PM
COMPLAINT Complaint for Damages For Violation of Civil Rights against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19713415.). Filed by Josue Torres.(Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet