California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-02628
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 12:34 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Black Nokia Cellular Phone Case Number: SYS-24-07-0563 ("Target Device") (1)
Terminated: 07/12/2024


Docket last updated: 08/11/2024 1:20 AM PDT
Friday, July 12, 2024
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to Black Nokia Cellular Phone Case Number: SYS-24 07-0563 ("Target Device"). (gac)
Related: [-]