Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00120
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Terminated:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2024 3:21 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alan Michael Sides
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kevin J. Leung (1)
Terminated: 08/05/2024


Docket last updated: 08/11/2024 3:56 AM EDT
Friday, July 12, 2024
Notice of Hearing Date as to Kevin J. Leung set for 8/5/2024 at 9:00 a.m. (btit)
Related: [-]
1 1 INFORMATION as to Kevin J. Leung (1) count(s) 1. (btit)
Related: [-]