New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:24-cv-06076
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 07, 2025 4:08 AM EST
Defendant
Bright Horizons Capital Corp.
2 Wells Ave.
Newton, MA 02459
Represented By
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC
2 Wells Ave.
Newton, MA 02459
Represented By
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Austin Hee
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc.
2 Wells Ave.
Newton, MA 02459
Represented By
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC
2 Wells Ave.
Newton, MA 02459
Represented By
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc.
2 Wells Ave.
Newton, MA 02459
Represented By
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Bright Horizons LLC
2 Wells Ave.
Newton, MA 02459
Represented By
Eli Zev Freedberg
Littler Mendelson, P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Brooks
600 West 139th St Apt 1
New York, NY 10031
Represented By
Chloe Liederman
Crumiller P.C.
contact info
Edward Emmett Keenan
Keenan & Bhatia, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
32 32 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 02/27 3:52 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/13 9:05 AM
ORDER granting30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTED. No further extensions. SO ORDERED. Replies due by 2/28/2025. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/12/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/12 1:16 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Further Support of 20 Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Eli Freedberg dated February 12, 2025. Document filed by Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
29 29 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/03 8:39 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:20 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Amanda Brooks..(Liederman, Chloe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/23 10:08 AM
ORDER granting27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 2/3/2025. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/23/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/22 5:24 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply opposing Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Chloe Liederman dated 1-22-25. Document filed by Amanda Brooks..(Liederman, Chloe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/10 10:13 AM
ORDER granting25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTED. Plaintiff shall serve any opposition by January 27, 2025. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be served by February 10, 2025. Responses due by 1/27/2025 Replies due by 2/10/2025. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/10/2024) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/09 1:38 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Chloe Liederman dated 12-9-24. Document filed by Amanda Brooks..(Liederman, Chloe)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Fri 12/06 12:23 PM
ORDER: On December 5, 2024, defendants filed a new motion to dismiss the amended complaint under Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Dkt. 20. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by December 27, 2024. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be served by January 10, 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/6/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
23 23 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/05 2:03 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC for Bright Horizons LLC; Corporate Parent Bright Horizons Capital Corp. for Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC; Corporate Parent Bright Horizons LLC for Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC; Corporate Parent Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc. for Bright Horizons Capital Corp.. Document filed by Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
22 22 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 12/05 1:03 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 12/05 1:02 PM
DECLARATION of Eli Z. Freedberg in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (EEOC Charge),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Complaint),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Amended Complaint)
20 20 motion Dismiss Thu 12/05 12:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/27 10:53 AM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re17 Amended Complaint,. GRANTED. SO ORDERED.Bright Horizons Capital Corp. answer due 12/5/2024; Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC answer due 12/5/2024; Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc. answer due 12/5/2024; Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC answer due 12/5/2024; Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc. answer due 12/5/2024; Bright Horizons LLC answer due 12/5/2024. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/27/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 11/26 12:42 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to the 17 Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Eli Z. Freedberg dated November 26, 2024. Document filed by Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/07 4:58 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Amanda Brooks. Related document:1 Complaint,..(Liederman, Chloe)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 9:36 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chloe Liederman on behalf of Amanda Brooks..(Liederman, Chloe)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Fri 11/01 6:47 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. GRANTED. No further extensions. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 11/7/2024. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/1/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to Amend Thu 10/31 11:51 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from E.E. Keenan dated 10/31/2024. Document filed by Amanda Brooks..(Keenan, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/11 12:08 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by October 29, 2024. No further opportunities to amend will ordinarily be granted. If plaintiff does amend, by November 19, 2024, defendants shall: (1) file an answer; (2) file a new motion to dismiss; or (3) submit a letter to the Court, copying plaintiff, stating that they rely on the previously filed motion to dismiss. It is further ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, plaintiff shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by October 29, 2024. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be served by November 12, 2024. At the time any reply is served, the moving party shall supply the Court with two (2) courtesy copies of all motion papers by mailing or delivering them to the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2024., Motions due by 11/19/2024.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/11/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
12 12 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 10/08 7:39 PM
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . . Document filed by Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Hee, Austin)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Affirmation in Support of Motion Tue 10/08 7:37 PM
AFFIRMATION of Freedberg, Eli in Support re:10 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint .. Document filed by Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Hee, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B Plaintiff's EEOC Charge
10 10 motion Dismiss Tue 10/08 7:35 PM
FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Document filed by Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC. Responses due by 10/22/2024 Return Date set for 10/29/2024 at 11:59 PM..(Hee, Austin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/25 2:20 PM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint,. GRANTED. No further extensions. SO ORDERED. Bright Horizons Capital Corp. answer due 10/8/2024; Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC answer due 10/8/2024; Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc. answer due 10/8/2024; Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC answer due 10/8/2024; Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc. answer due 10/8/2024; Bright Horizons LLC answer due 10/8/2024. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/25/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/25 9:41 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Eli Z. Freedberg dated September 25, 2024. Document filed by Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/11 11:43 AM
ORDER granting6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint,. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Bright Horizons Capital Corp. answer due 9/27/2024; Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC answer due 9/27/2024; Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc. answer due 9/27/2024; Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC answer due 9/27/2024; Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc. answer due 9/27/2024; Bright Horizons LLC answer due 9/27/2024. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/11/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 09/10 5:11 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to the 1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Eli Z. Freedberg dated September 10, 2024. Document filed by Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/10 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eli Zev Freedberg on behalf of Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(Freedberg, Eli)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 08/12 10:30 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 08/12 10:28 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 08/12 10:28 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 08/12 10:29 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 11, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sun 08/11 7:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc.; Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC; Bright Horizons Capital Corp.; Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC; Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc.; Bright Horizons LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Amanda Brooks..(Keenan, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sun 08/11 7:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Keenan, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 08/11 7:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Bright Horizons Capital Corp., Bright Horizons Childrens Centers LLC, Bright Horizons Childrens Centers, Inc., Bright Horizons Family Solutions LLC, Bright Horizons Family Solutions, Inc., Bright Horizons LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29733931)Document filed by Amanda Brooks..(Keenan, Edward)
Related: [-]