Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:24-cv-01886
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 07, 2025 10:00 AM EST
Defendant
BayCare Health System, Inc.
Represented By
Eliza Horne Murnane
Johnson Jackson PLLC
contact info
Erin G. Jackson
Johnson Jackson LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pamela Patel
505 E Jackson Street Suite 305
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Derek Usman
The Usman Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, February 07, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Hearing - Reschedule Fri 02/07 9:49 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The final pretrial conference previously scheduled for 4/9/2026 and jury trial previously scheduled for the term beginning 5/4/2026 are rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2026 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial set for the July 2026 Trial Term commencing 7/6/2026 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (CCB)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Fri 02/07 9:43 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed 25 Motion to Amend the Case Management and Scheduling Order to reschedule the trial and final pretrial dates. Notice rescheduling same will follow. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/7/2025. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
25 25 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 02/06 4:53 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend24 Case Management Scheduling Order by BayCare Health System, Inc.. (Jackson, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
24 24 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 01/23 4:52 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 12/10/2025. Pretrial statement due by 4/2/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2026 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial set for the May 2026 Trial Term commencing 5/4/2026 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/23/2025. (CCB)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Case Management Report Thu 01/23 2:52 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Jackson, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/21 4:22 PM
NOTICE by BayCare Health System, Inc. re3 Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Parties Nonconsent to IDEAL Program (Jackson, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
21 21 minutes Status Conference Tue 01/14 12:09 PM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone: IDEAL STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/14/2025. (DIGITAL) (JS)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/14 10:52 AM
ORDER setting IDEAL case management deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 1/14/2025. (BEE)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/23 1:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Motion for IDEAL Program hearing. Videoconference set for 1/14/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. The court will send counsel a calendar entry containing a link to the videoconference information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/23/2024. (BEE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 12/17 12:37 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Derek Usman on behalf of Pamela Patel. Lead Counsel: Derek P. Usman. (Usman, Derek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 12/05 12:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE AMANDA ARNOLD SANSONE by BayCare Health System, Inc.. (Jackson, Erin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
16 16 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 12/02 4:51 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Derek Usman of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of appearance Mon 12/02 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eliza Horne Murnane on behalf of BayCare Health System, Inc. (Murnane, Eliza)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 12/02 10:57 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by BayCare Health System, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Jackson, Erin)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 12/02 10:56 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by BayCare Health System, Inc. (Jackson, Erin) Modified text on 12/2/2024 (MGB)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/02 10:52 AM
Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by BayCare Health System, Inc. (Jackson, Erin) Modified text on 12/2/2024 (GL)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 12/02 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Erin G. Jackson on behalf of BayCare Health System, Inc. Lead Counsel: Erin G. Jackson. (Jackson, Erin) Modified text on 12/2/2024 (GL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of service executed Thu 11/07 12:53 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 10/01/2024 by Pamela Patel as to BayCare Health System, Inc.. (Usman, Derek) Modified to correct service date on 11/7/2024 (LSS)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Fri 11/01 8:37 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 unopposed Motion to Correct Defendant's name. The Clerk will note. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/1/2024. (Jung, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
8 8 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 10/31 2:00 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Correct Docket and Case Caption by Pamela Patel. (Usman, Derek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 10/30 3:54 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) 5 Motion to Correct. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/30/2024. (Jung, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
6 6 misc Status report Wed 10/23 9:07 PM
STATUS report by Pamela Patel. (Usman, Derek)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 10/23 9:02 PM
MOTION to Correct Defendant's Name by Pamela Patel. (Usman, Derek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
4 4 order Order Thu 10/17 10:55 AM
ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a status report concerning service of proceed on the Defendant on or before 10/24/2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/17/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Wed 08/14 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (JS)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 08/12 8:39 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-1886-WFJ-AAS. (AA)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 11, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 08/11 10:08 PM
COMPLAINT against BayCare Hospital System, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22393524) filed by Pamela Patel.(Usman, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet