Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-mj-01162
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2024
Terminated:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2024 2:15 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sarina Sophia DiPiazza
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ruben Balderas-Gonzalez (1)
Terminated: 08/07/2024
Represented By
Alejandro Guerra
Law Office Of Alejandro Guerra
contact info
Christopher George Gonzalez
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/12/2024 2:22 AM CDT
Friday, July 12, 2024
Arrest of Ruben Balderas-Gonzalez, filed. (le7)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 13, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ruben Balderas-Gonzalez (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 7/15/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano (le7)
Related: [-]