Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Audrey G Fleissig
Case #: 4:24-cv-01102
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 4:13 AM CST
Defendant
Berkeley Police Department
Represented By
Timothy J. Reichardt
Reichardt Noce LLC
contact info
Daniel Timothy Mooney
Reichardt Noce LLC
contact info
Defendant
Officer O'Shay Conway
Represented By
Timothy J. Reichardt
Reichardt Noce LLC
contact info
Daniel Timothy Mooney
Reichardt Noce LLC
contact info
Defendant
Officer Bryan Sutherland
Represented By
Timothy J. Reichardt
Reichardt Noce LLC
contact info
Daniel Timothy Mooney
Reichardt Noce LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John R. Cutts
6221 Garfield Avenue
Berkeley, MO 63134

GPO Sep 12 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Relief Sought, construed as a motion to amend the complaint, is DENIED as moot. ECF No. 9. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Joinder of Necessary Parties, construed as a motion to amend the complaint, is DENIED as moot. ECF No. 10. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to Plaintiff a blank "Civil Complaint" form. Plaintiff may request additional forms as needed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff has until Tuesday, September 24, 2024, to file his amended complaint without seeking permission from the Court. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 9/24/2024.). Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/12/24. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Complaint Form)(KJS)
GPO Sep 18 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED as MOOT. ECF No. 6. Defendant shall have until October 1, 2024, to respond to the amended complaint. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 10/1/2024.). Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/18/2024. (JMP)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
27 27 motion Amend/Correct Tue 05/20 8:47 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by Plaintiff John R. Cutts.(CLT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Second Amended Complaint
Thursday, February 20, 2025
26 26 2 pgs misc Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT) Thu 02/20 2:26 PM
MEMORANDUM TO THE COURT re25 Memorandum by Plaintiff John R. Cutts. (JMP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
25 25 5 pgs misc Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT) Tue 02/11 2:45 PM
MEMORANDUM re24 Order, by Defendants Berkeley Police Department, O'Shay Conway, Bryan Sutherland. (Mooney, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Wed 02/05 1:37 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before February 12, 2025, Defendants shall provide the Court with a status update on Plaintiff's charges and trial before the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Berkeley Consolidated Division, and address what impact these proceedings may have on the case before this Court. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Related [+] Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/5/2025. (CLT)
Related: [-] sponse to Court due by 2/12/2025.
misc Order Receipt Wed 02/05 1:37 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 24. Wed Feb 5 13:37:53 CST 2025 (CLT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
23 23 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Tue 01/14 1:55 PM
Certificate of Service for22 Response to Motion by Plaintiff John R. Cutts. (Served via U.S.P.S. instead of via email.)(KJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
22 22 respm Response to Motion Wed 10/16 3:21 PM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss re15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant O'Shay Conway. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
21 21 respm Surresponse to Motion (Need Leave of Court) Tue 10/15 8:12 AM
SURRESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff John R. Cutts. (CLT)
Related: [-]
20 20 order A Docket Text Order Tue 10/15 8:10 AM
Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants19 MOTION for Leave to Respond to Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff John R. Cutts. Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/15/2024. (CLT)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 10/15 8:12 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 20. Tue Oct 15 08:12:53 CDT 2024 (Thoele, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
19 19 motion Leave to Fri 10/11 1:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Respond to Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff John R. Cutts.(CLT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, October 10, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/10 4:43 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Berkeley Police Department, O'Shay Conway, Bryan Sutherland. (Mooney, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
17 17 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/03 1:23 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff John R. Cutts. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
16 16 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 10/01 6:38 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Berkeley Police Department, O'Shay Conway, Bryan Sutherland. (Mooney, Daniel)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Tue 10/01 6:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Berkeley Police Department, O'Shay Conway, Bryan Sutherland. (Mooney, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
misc Order Receipt Fri 09/20 1:56 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 14. Fri Sep 20 13:56:17 CDT 2024 (Spurgeon, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Memorandum & Order Wed 09/18 11:52 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss is DENIED as MOOT. ECF No. 6. Defendant shall have until October 1, 2024, to respond to the amended complaint. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 10/1/2024.). Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/18/2024. (JMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/17 9:30 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Berkeley Police Department, O'Shay Conway, Bryan Sutherland Amendment to1 Complaint,, filed by John R. Cutts. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by John R. Cutts.(JMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Thursday, September 12, 2024
12 12 3 pgs order Memorandum & Order Thu 09/12 3:19 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Relief Sought, construed as a motion to amend the complaint, is DENIED as moot. ECF No.9 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Joinder of Necessary Parties, construed as a motion to amend the complaint, is DENIED as moot. ECF No.10 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to Plaintiff a blank "Civil Complaint" form. Plaintiff may request additional forms as needed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff has until Tuesday, September 24, 2024, to file his amended complaint without seeking permission from the Court. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 9/24/2024.). Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/12/24.(KJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Complaint Form
misc Order Receipt Thu 09/12 3:19 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12. Thu Sep 12 15:19:54 CDT 2024 (Shirley, Kelley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/10 2:37 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff John R. Cutts. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
10 10 motion Joinder Mon 09/09 3:54 PM
PRO SE MOTION for Joinder of Necessary Parties Under FRCP 19 by Plaintiff John R. Cutts. (KJS)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Mon 09/09 3:53 PM
PRO SE MOTION to MODIFY RELIEF SOUGHT re:1 Complaint, by Plaintiff John R. Cutts. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
8 8 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 09/03 10:47 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel Timothy Mooney for Defendants Berkeley Police Department, O'Shay Conway, Bryan Sutherland. (Mooney, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 09/03 10:45 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Berkeley Police Department, O'Shay Conway, Bryan Sutherland. Related [+]
Related: [-] ichardt, Timothy
6 6 motion Dismiss Case Tue 09/03 10:45 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Berkeley Police Department, O'Shay Conway, Bryan Sutherland. Related [+]
Related: [-] ichardt, Timothy
5 5 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 09/03 10:43 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy J. Reichardt for Defendants Berkeley Police Department, O'Shay Conway, Bryan Sutherland. Related [+]
Related: [-] ichardt, Timothy
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/14 12:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by John R. Cutts. Berkeley Police Department served on 8/12/2024, answer due 9/3/2024; O'Shay Conway served on 8/12/2024, answer due 9/3/2024; Bryan Sutherland served on 8/12/2024, answer due 9/3/2024.(CLT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Attachment
Monday, August 12, 2024
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Mon 08/12 10:32 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff John R. Cutts Process Server: Pam King Wheetley (JWD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/12 10:31 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant Berkeley Police Department, O'Shay Conway, Bryan Sutherland, in the amount of $405.00 receipt number 21813, Jury Demand, filed by John R. Cutts.(JWD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form,
Att: 3 Summons Berkeley Police Department,
Att: 4 Summons Conway,
Att: 5 Summons Sutherland
misc Case Opening Notification Mon 08/12 10:34 AM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. 3 Summons(es) issued and hand delivered to plaintiff John R. Cutts. (JWD)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY) Mon 08/12 10:34 AM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY) Mon 08/12 11:01 AM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Aug 12 11:01:15 CDT 2024 (admin,)
Related: [-]