New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joanna Seybert
Referred: James M Wicks
Case #: 2:24-cv-05612
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause12:191 Bank Foreclosure
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 4:35 AM EST
Defendant
All Suffolk Carting Corp.
Represented By
Howard B Arber
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth Cordero
Represented By
Howard B Arber
contact info
Defendant
NBAJ Properties LLC
Represented By
Howard B Arber
contact info
Plaintiff
Allison Lending LLC
Represented By
Alyssa L. Kapner
Margolin, Weinreb & Nierer, LLP
contact info
Alan H Weinreb
Margolin, Weinreb & Nierer, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
ORDER: In light of the representations set forth in Plaintiff's letter (ECF No.15 ), the parties are directed to file a status report on or before June 20, 2025 advising the Court on the status of Defendants' completion of the Settlement Agreement and the anticipated Stipulation of Dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 1/22/2025. (JDP).
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Wed 01/22 1:24 PM
ORDER: In light of the representations set forth in Plaintiff's letter (ECF No.15 ), the parties are directed to file a status report on or before June 20, 2025 advising the Court on the status of Defendants' completion of the Settlement Agreement and the anticipated Stipulation of Dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 1/22/2025. (JDP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
15 15 misc Status Report Tue 01/21 4:57 PM
STATUS REPORT re Settlement Agreement by Allison Lending LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
ORDER. In light of the representations set forth in Plaintiff's letter14 , the parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before January 24, 2025 advising the Court on whether the Settlement Agreement has been implemented or advise if the settlement has not been consummated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 12/24/2024. (JDP).
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Tue 12/24 10:27 AM
ORDER. In light of the representations set forth in Plaintiff's letter14 , the parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before January 24, 2025 advising the Court on whether the Settlement Agreement has been implemented or advise if the settlement has not been consummated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 12/24/2024. (JDP)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
14 14 1 pgs misc Status Report Mon 12/23 3:25 PM
STATUS REPORT by Allison Lending LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/13 4:19 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks: CIVIL CAUSE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference held on 11/13/2024 at 2:00 PM, parties reached agreement in principle, subject to execution of settlement and forbearance agreement. On or before June 15, 2025 , the parties shall file either a stipulation of dismissal, or a Confession of Judgment if there is a default under the Settlement and Forbearance Agreement. Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a joint status letter on or before December 20, 2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 11/13/2024. (DF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
ORDER granting13 Motion to Appear by Telephone/Video. In light of the representation made in Plaintiff's letter (ECF No.13 ), Plaintiff's representative is hereby permitted to appear virtually/telephonically for the Settlement Conference on November 13, 2024 at 2:00PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 11/12/2024.(JDP).
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone/Video Tue 11/12 9:35 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Appear by Telephone/Video. In light of the representation made in Plaintiff's letter (ECF No.13 ), Plaintiff's representative is hereby permitted to appear virtually/telephonically for the Settlement Conference on November 13, 2024 at 2:00PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 11/12/2024.(JDP)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
13 13 motion Appear by Telephone/Video Mon 11/11 2:45 PM
Letter MOTION to Appear by Telephone/Video re Plaintiff's representative, for the 11/13/24 Settlement Conference by Allison Lending LLC. (Kapner, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/11 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa L. Kapner on behalf of Allison Lending LLC (aty to be noticed) (Kapner, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/08 1:45 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Suffolk Carting Corp.; Kenneth Cordero; and NBAJ Properties LLC (Arber, Howard) Modified on 10/9/2024 to correct filers. (CV).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/02 11:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allison Lending LLC. Kenneth Cordero served on 9/18/2024, answer due 10/9/2024. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
ORDER: In light of Defendants' letter requesting a settlement conference, see ECF No.9 , an in-person Settlement Conference has been set for November 13, 2024, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1020 before the undersigned. All parties must be present. Parties are to submit their respective confidential settlement positions ex parte to the Chamber's email no later than seven (7) days prior to the scheduled conference date. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of the undersigned's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference, which is available on the Court's website. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/30/2024.(JDP).
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Mon 09/30 3:22 PM
ORDER: In light of Defendants' letter requesting a settlement conference, see ECF No.9 , an in-person Settlement Conference has been set for November 13, 2024, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1020 before the undersigned. All parties must be present. Parties are to submit their respective confidential settlement positions ex parte to the Chamber's email no later than seven (7) days prior to the scheduled conference date. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of the undersigned's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference, which is available on the Court's website. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks on 9/30/2024.(JDP)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Fri 09/27 3:20 PM
Letter by All Suffolk Carting Corp., Kenneth Cordero, NBAJ Properties LLC (Arber, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/03 4:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allison Lending LLC. NBAJ Properties LLC served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/03 4:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allison Lending LLC. All Suffolk Carting Corp. served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 08/13 8:57 AM
Summons Issued as to All Suffolk Carting Corp., Kenneth Cordero, NBAJ Properties LLC. (CG)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 08/13 8:52 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CG)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 08/13 8:47 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (CG)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/13 8:50 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CG)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 08/12 11:36 AM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Allison Lending LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/12 11:35 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allison Lending LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/12 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT against All Suffolk Carting Corp., Kenneth Cordero, NBAJ Properties LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18167275 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Allison Lending LLC. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Exhibit F,
Att: 2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice