California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:24-cv-05036
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 1:40 AM PST
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
Defendant
Rasier-CA, LLC
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff
WHB 999
Represented By
Walter E. Cubberly
Williams Hart & Boundas, LLP
contact info
Walt Cubberly
Williams Hart & Boundas, LLP
contact info
Brian Alan Abramson
Williams Hart & Boundas, LLP
contact info
Brian Abramson
Williams Hart & Boundas, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 29, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/29 8:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WHB 999. All Defendants. PROOF OF SERVICE (Cubberly, Walter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 08/14 12:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Wed 08/14 12:09 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: WHB 999 v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-05036-CRB cc: JPMDL (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Mon 08/12 3:46 PM
Proposed Summons. (Abramson, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 08/12 3:45 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by WHB 999 (Abramson, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 08/12 2:35 PM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/12 10:17 AM
COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19715209.). Filed by WHB 999.(Cubberly, Walter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet