California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-06800
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 1:15 AM PST
Defendant
Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC
Represented By
Adam C Keating
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Hye Yoon Kim
Duane Morris
contact info
Defendant
The Goal Group LLC
Represented By
Adam C Keating
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Hye Yoon Kim
Duane Morris
contact info
Plaintiff
Taylor Harris
Represented By
Grace A. Starling
Radford Scott LLP
contact info
Justin M. Scott
Radford Scott LLP
contact info
Laboni A. Hoq
Hoq Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
33 33 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 4:09 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting32 Non-Resident Attorney Nicolette J. Zulli APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC, designating Denio, Dillon as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (aus)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
32 32 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 04/23 11:53 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicolette J. Zulli to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39564358) filed by Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC. (Denio, Dillon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 14, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 04/14 4:25 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dillon Denio counsel for Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC. Adding Dillon Denio as counsel of record for Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC and The Goal Group LLC, d/b/a/ TG Federal for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC and The Goal Group LLC, d/b/a/ TG Federal. (Attorney Dillon Denio added to party Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dillon Denio added to party The Goal Group LLC(pty:dft))(Denio, Dillon)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 03/17 12:01 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: The Court notes that, pursuant to the current case schedule, this matter has a discovery deadline set for a date between now and June 30, 2025. For planning purposes, Magistrate Judge Audero advises the parties that she will be unavailable during the period May 6, 2025 to May 27, 2025, and encourages the parties to plan accordingly for any discovery needs they may now have or anticipate, especially in light of the strict discovery dispute resolution timelines of Central District of California Local Civil Rule 37 and Judge Audero's Procedures and Requirements. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
29 29 misc Report Tue 02/04 9:22 AM
JOINT E-DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT filed by Plaintiff Taylor Harris. (Starling, Grace)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
28 28 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 01/27 11:31 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: On 12/17/2024, the Court issued a Standing Order re Discovery of Electronically-Stored Information ("ESI Standing Order"). (ECF No.27 .) The ESI Standing Order required the parties to jointly file a report providing their plan for such discovery within thirty (30) days. (Id.) To date, the parties have not complied with the ESI Standing Order. The parties are ordered to show cause, by no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, why they should not be sanctioned for their failure to comply with the ESI Standing Order. This Order to Show Cause will be discharged without further action if the parties timely file the required report. It is so ordered. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
27 27 3 pgs order Order Tue 12/17 1:06 PM
STANDING ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY-STORED INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. See document for details. (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
26 26 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 12/10 4:46 PM
ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 9/8/2025 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 5 Days**) set for 9/30/2025 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Tue 12/10 4:43 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/11/2025. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
24 24 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/05 2:21 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting23 Non-Resident Attorney Adam Keating APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC, designating Hye Yoon Kim as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 12/05 9:39 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam Keating to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/25/2024, Receipt No. ACACDC38645287) filed by Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC. (Kim, Hye Yoon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 02, 2024
22 22 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 12/02 10:39 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On its own motion, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 a.m. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. The parties' Joint Motion to Appear Remotely21 is DENIED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
21 21 motion Appear Fri 11/29 8:02 AM
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave of All Parties to Appear for Scheduling Conference Remotely filed by Plaintiff Taylor Harris. (Starling, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
20 20 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Wed 11/27 11:34 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application 19 regarding Application17 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is STRICKEN. (smom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Tue 11/26 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam Keating to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38645287)17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (sbou)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
18 18 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 11/25 3:31 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff Taylor Harris, Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC.. (Kim, Hye Yoon)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 11/25 11:53 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam Keating to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38645287) filed by Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC. (Kim, Hye Yoon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 14, 2024
16 16 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/14 12:29 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Grace A. Starling APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Taylor Harris, designating Laboni Hoq as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 11/08 12:39 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Grace A. Starling to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Taylor Harris (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38552167) filed by Plaintiff Taylor Harris. (Hoq, Laboni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 11/06 12:34 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (rs)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 10/28 2:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC.(Kim, Hye Yoon)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 10/28 2:23 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC, (Attorney Hye Yoon Kim added to party Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Hye Yoon Kim added to party The Goal Group LLC(pty:dft))(Kim, Hye Yoon)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/28 2:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC (Kim, Hye Yoon)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/20 7:36 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Taylor Harris. upon Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/28/2024, answer due 10/28/2024; The Goal Group LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/28/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Defendants' Counsel. (Scott, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 09/10 12:55 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Laboni A. Hoq counsel for Plaintiff Taylor Harris. Adding Laboni A. Hoq as counsel of record for Taylor Harris for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Taylor Harris. (Attorney Laboni A. Hoq added to party Taylor Harris(pty:pla))(Hoq, Laboni)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
8 8 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 08/14 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Taylor Harris, (Scott, Justin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 08/14 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 08/14 9:45 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet, No. 2 Proposed Summons to Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, and No. 3 Proposed Summons to The Goal Group d/b/a TG Federal should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 08/14 9:40 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC, The Goal Group LLC. (lh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons as to Defendant The Goal Group LLC
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 08/14 9:28 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
3 3 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 08/14 9:28 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 08/14 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 08/12 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38004922 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Taylor Harris. (Attorney Justin M. Scott added to party Taylor Harris(pty:pla))(Scott, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons to Motion Recruitment Partners, LLC,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons to The Goal Group d/b/a TG Federal