Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Case #: 9:24-cv-80974
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Terminated:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 5:33 AM EST
Defendant
Sergio Muriel
Defendant
Promise Behavioral Health
Defendant
West Palm Beach Police Department
Plaintiff
Yumba Kamanda
2817 Corby Blvd.
South Bend, IN 46615


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
5 5 4 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 08/13 3:16 PM
ORDER DENYING3 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
4 4 motion Volunteer Attorney Program Mon 08/12 2:40 PM
MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Yumba Kamanda. (kpe)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 08/12 2:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Yumba Kamanda. (kpe)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 08/12 2:37 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens Mon 08/12 2:35 PM
Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against All Defendants, filed by Yumba Kamanda. Filing fee $ 405.00. IFP Filed.(kpe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet