Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Case #: 2:24-cv-14258
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 5:35 AM EST
Defendant
Robert Hoying
Represented By
Kirstie Hayduk
Chartwell Law
contact info
Defendant
Brent Crawford
Represented By
Kirstie Hayduk
Chartwell Law
contact info
Defendant
Noble Park Properties LLC
Represented By
Kirstie Hayduk
Chartwell Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Greer
7029 Maidstone Drive
Pt. St. Lucie, FL 34986
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bridge Park Hotel LLC
Terminated: 08/21/2024
Defendant
Crawford Hoying Development Partners LLC
Terminated: 08/21/2024
Defendant
Dublin Home 2 Investments LLC
Terminated: 08/21/2024
Defendant
Home2 Suites by Hilton
Terminated: 08/21/2024
Defendant
Noble Park Properties
Terminated: 08/21/2024


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
33 33 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 12/03 4:01 PM
RESPONSE in Support re29 MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,6 Order,27 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC. (Hayduk, Kirstie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
32 32 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 11/27 2:36 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER striking31 Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss29 . Pursuant to the Court's Order Requiring Combined Responses6 , "[a]ll filings in this case must be prepared using 12-point Times New Roman font that is double-spaced and fully justified." On or before December 4 2024 , Defendants shall file a renewed Reply that complies with the Court's Order. Any request to exceed the page limits set by the Local Rules must be made in the form of a properly filed motion, following conferral. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/27/2024. (jj01)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Wed 11/27 3:19 PM
Reset Deadline per DE#32 as to29 MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,6 Order,27 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Reply due by 12/4/2024. (scn)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/22 6:05 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re29 MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,6 Order,27 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC. (Hayduk, Kirstie)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
30 30 respm Response to Motion Fri 11/15 4:04 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re29 MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,6 Order,27 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven Greer. Replies due by 11/22/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
29 29 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/05 6:08 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,6 Order,27 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC. Responses due by 11/19/2024. (Hayduk, Kirstie)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 11/01 5:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's25 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and denying as moot24 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint8 . Plaintiff's Corrected Second Amended Complaint is treated as Plaintiff's operative pleading27 . Plaintiff is advised to fully comply with the Local Rules, which require any motion for leave to file an amended pleading to attach the proposed pleading as an exhibit to the motion for leave. See S.D. Fla. L.R. 15.1. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/1/2024. (jj01)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
27 27 47 pgs cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Tue 10/22 1:23 PM
CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC, filed by Steven Greer.(cds)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Contract
26 26 46 pgs cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Tue 10/22 11:37 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC, filed by Steven Greer.(cds)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Contract
25 25 motion Amend/Correct Tue 10/22 11:33 AM
MOTION for Leave to Amend re8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Steven Greer. Responses due by 11/5/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
24 24 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 10/15 11:37 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC. Responses due by 10/29/2024. (Hayduk, Kirstie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 10/03 8:52 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 Defendants' Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint8 on or before October 15, 2024 , in accordance with the Court's Combined Response Order6 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 10/3/2024. (mp01)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Thu 10/03 9:14 AM
Set Response Due Deadline per DE 23 Order: Defendants response due 10/15/2024. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
22 22 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Wed 10/02 9:04 AM
Clerk's Non-Entry of Default as to Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC - Motions Terminated:21 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Reason: Responsive pleading (i.e. Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, Motion to Dismiss Complaint, etc) has been filed Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/2/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Wed 10/02 9:03 AM
MOTION/AFFIRMATION of Default Entry as to Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC by Steven Greer. (cds)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 10/02 8:56 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying17 Plaintiff's Motion for Electronic Filing Permission. See S.D. Fla. CM/ECF Admin. Proc. 2C, https://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/policies-procedures. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 10/2/2024. (mp01)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/02 8:55 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION for Extension of Time 2 week extension to file response re8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal filed by Steven Greer. Replies due by 10/9/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time Tue 10/01 5:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time 2 week extension to file response re8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC. Responses due by 10/15/2024.(Hayduk, Kirstie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Correspondence between parties
Monday, September 30, 2024
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/30 1:45 PM
MOTION for ECF Filing Rights by Steven Greer. (cds)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/30 1:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION for Extension of Time 2 week extension to file answer re8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal filed by Steven Greer. Replies due by 10/7/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 09/26 10:14 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice14 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants' Motion does not contain a certificate of conference, as required by the Local Rules. See S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/26/2024. (mp01)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time Wed 09/25 3:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time 2 week extension to file answer re8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC. Responses due by 10/9/2024. (Hayduk, Kirstie)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 09/25 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirstie Hayduk on behalf of Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC. Attorney Kirstie Hayduk added to party Brent Crawford(pty:dft), Attorney Kirstie Hayduk added to party Robert Hoying(pty:dft), Attorney Kirstie Hayduk added to party Noble Park Properties LLC(pty:dft). (Hayduk, Kirstie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
12 12 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 09/17 10:49 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE as to9 Summons Issued Robert Hoying filed by Steven Greer. (cds)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 09/17 10:47 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steven Greer. Brent Crawford served on 9/10/2024, response/answer due 10/1/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 09/17 10:46 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Steven Greer. Noble Park Properties LLC served on 9/10/2024, response/answer due 10/1/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 08/29 11:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Brent Crawford, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties LLC. (cds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
8 8 44 pgs cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Wed 08/21 1:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Hoying, Brent Crawford, Noble Park Properties LLC, filed by Steven Greer.(nwn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 08/13 12:55 PM
ORDER DISMISSING1 COMPLAINT AND PERMITTING REPLEADING ( Amended Complaint due by 8/26/2024.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 08/13 11:35 AM
ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 08/12 3:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Bridge Park Hotel LLC, Crawford Hoying Development Partners LLC, Dublin Home 2 Investments LLC, Home2 Suites by Hilton, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties. (ls)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee) Mon 08/12 3:42 PM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 8/12/2024 in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number 3539 (ls)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) to receive Notices of Electronic Filing Mon 08/12 3:22 PM
Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Steven Greer to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: steve@greerjournal.com (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 08/12 3:21 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/12 3:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Bridge Park Hotel LLC, Crawford Hoying Development Partners LLC, Dublin Home 2 Investments LLC, Home2 Suites by Hilton, Robert Hoying, Noble Park Properties. Filing fees $ 405.00 (DUE), filed by Steven Greer.(pc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)