Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Ray Kent
Case #: 1:24-cv-00832
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Terminated:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 4:32 AM EST
counter-claimant
Latitude Outdoors LLC
Represented By
Matthew Gipson
Price Heneveld, LLP
contact info
counter-defendant
Tethrd LLC
Represented By
Eliza Del Carmen
Morris Manning & Martin LLP
contact info
Scott Barnett
Honigman Llp (bloomfield Hills)
contact info
Daniel L. Huynh
Morris Manning & Martin LLP
contact info
defendant
Latitude Outdoors LLC
Represented By
Matthew Gipson
Price Heneveld, LLP
contact info
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
Represented By
Terence J. Linn
Gardner Linn Burkhart & Ondersma LLP
contact info
plaintiff
Tethrd LLC
Represented By
Eliza Del Carmen
Morris Manning & Martin LLP
contact info
Scott Barnett
Honigman Llp (bloomfield Hills)
contact info
Daniel L. Huynh
Morris Manning & Martin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
35 35 misc Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark Fri 03/07 8:37 AM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on the determination of a PATENT ACTION (ems)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order of Dismissal
Thursday, March 06, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation to Dismiss Thu 03/06 1:48 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting STIPULATION to dismiss33 ; all claims and counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice; cancelling 6/12/2025 Markman hearing/informal conference; closing the case; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 03/06 12:49 PM
STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiff Tethrd LLC (Huynh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 02/19 9:07 AM
ORDER granting STIPULATION31 ; amending certain case management order deadlines; additional requests to extend will not be favored; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
31 31 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order (separate documents) Tue 02/18 4:01 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Further Amend Case Management Order by plaintiff Tethrd LLC (Huynh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 23, 2025
30 30 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 01/23 10:22 AM
STIPULATED ORDER amending certain Case Management Order deadlines; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
29 29 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Tue 01/21 1:42 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to amend Case Management Order by counter-claimant Latitude Outdoors LLC, defendant Latitude Outdoors LLC (Gipson, Matthew) Modified text on 1/21/2025 (ems)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
28 28 adr Facilitative Mediation Report Wed 01/15 11:58 AM
REPORT of facilitative mediation held 01/13/2025; mediation is complete; (Linn, Terence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
27 27 service Certificate of Service Thu 12/19 1:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by counter-claimant Latitude Outdoors LLC, defendant Latitude Outdoors LLC for Preliminary ID of Invalidating Prior Art (Gipson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
26 26 service Certificate of Service Mon 11/25 5:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Tethrd LLC for VOLUNTARY EXCHANGE OF DOCUMENTS (Huynh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Certificate of Service Mon 11/25 2:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by counter-claimant Latitude Outdoors LLC, defendant Latitude Outdoors LLC for Voluntary Exchange of Documents (Gipson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
24 24 misc Disclosure of Claims Alleged to be Infringed Wed 11/20 4:42 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CLAIMS alleged to be infringed submitted for filing by plaintiff Tethrd LLC (Huynh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Wed 11/20 12:18 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 361837 as to plaintiff Tethrd LLC (klb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
23 23 service Certificate of Service Mon 11/18 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Tethrd LLC for Initial Disclosures (Barnett, Scott)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Certificate of Service Mon 11/18 3:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by counter-claimant Latitude Outdoors LLC, defendant Latitude Outdoors LLC for Rule 26(a) disclosures (Gipson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
21 21 13 pgs order Order on Proposed Order Mon 11/18 3:13 PM
ORDER granting PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER18 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
Related: [-]
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Mon 11/18 2:30 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 274375 as to defendant Latitude Outdoors LLC (jmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
20 20 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator Thu 11/14 1:56 PM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Terence J. Linn; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 11/21/2024 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 11/21/2024 (kmd)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document) Thu 11/14 1:51 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER18 to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/13 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Mediator by plaintiff Tethrd LLC (Huynh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
18 18 motion Proposed Order Tue 11/12 9:42 AM
PROPOSED ORDER regarding Stipulated Protective Order by counter-claimant Latitude Outdoors LLC, defendant Latitude Outdoors LLC (Gipson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
17 17 order Case Management Order - Patent Case Wed 10/30 4:09 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: informal conference/Markman hearing set for 6/12/2025 at 01:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 By Telephone Wed 10/30 2:13 PM
MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before District Judge Jane M. Beckering (Court Reporter: not recorded) (rmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
15 15 misc Restricted Access Court Document Thu 10/24 9:02 AM
(RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT (instructions for 10/30/2024 telephonic scheduling conference) [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Tethrd LLC, Latitude Outdoors LLC only] (lep)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
14 14 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Wed 10/23 6:09 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT Corrected (Barnett, Scott)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Wed 10/23 4:33 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Barnett, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
12 12 8 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Tue 10/01 12:54 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/30/2024 at 01:30 PM by telephone before District Judge Jane M. Beckering; joint status report due by 10/23/2024; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 09/26 5:49 PM
Amended ANSWER to Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim,7 by Tethrd LLC (Huynh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/25 8:27 AM
ORDER striking answer9 ; Counter-Defendant shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 09/24 11:54 AM
ANSWER to Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim7 by Tethrd LLC (Huynh, Daniel) Modified text on 9/24/2024 (ems)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 09/13 5:49 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eliza Del Carmen on behalf of plaintiff Tethrd LLC (Del Carmen, Eliza)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 09/13 6:08 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel L. Huynh on behalf of plaintiff Tethrd LLC (Huynh, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
8 8 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/03 3:18 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Latitude Outdoors LLC (Gipson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 09/03 3:17 PM
ANSWER to complaint,1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Tethrd LLC by Latitude Outdoors LLC (Gipson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - trademark use image,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - trademark use image,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - social media comments
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
6 6 service Proof of Service Wed 08/14 11:09 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Tethrd LLC re Summons Issued3 , complaint,1 (Barnett, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
5 5 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/13 10:41 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tethrd LLC (Barnett, Scott)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark Tue 08/13 9:27 AM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on the filing of a PATENT ACTION (ems)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/13 9:18 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Latitude Outdoors LLC (ems)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Tue 08/13 9:14 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/12 3:19 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Latitude Outdoors L.L.C. filed by Tethrd LLC (Barnett, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - 175 Patent,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - 556 Patent,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - 2023 Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - 2024 Letter,
Att: 6 Summons Summons - Latitude Outdoors L.L.C.
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Mon 08/12 3:23 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Tethrd LLC in the amount of $405, receipt number BMIWDC-7454192 (Barnett, Scott)
Related: [-]