District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Jia M Cobb
Case #: 1:24-cv-02342
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 4:25 AM EST
Defendant
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY
Represented By
Robin Lynn Stevenson Burroughs
Venable LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ALLEN FRIERSON
Represented By
Robert Allen Ragland
Ragland Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 05, 2024
6 6 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 09/05 4:53 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. (Burroughs, Robin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
5 5 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Thu 08/29 10:53 AM
RESPONSE re1 Notice of Removal filed by ALLEN FRIERSON. (Ragland, Robert) Modified docket text and add link on 8/29/2024 (zdp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
4 4 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Mon 08/26 11:19 AM
Receipt on 8/26/2024 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2023-CAB-002475. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
3 3 motion Dismiss Mon 08/19 6:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY.(Burroughs, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
2 2 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Tue 08/13 8:39 AM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal,(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/13 8:38 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 08/12 7:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of DC, case number 2023-CAB-002475 Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADCDC-11087577 filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY.(Burroughs, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Superior Court Documents Superior Court Docket,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet