Arizona District Court
Judge:Roslyn O Silver
Case #: 2:23-cv-01672
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 13, 2024 7:08 PM MST
Defendant
St Luke's Behavioral Hospital LP
Defendant
Steward Health Care System LLC
Intervenor
United States of America
Represented By
Anne Elizabeth Nelson
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas N Crumbley
Represented By
Susan M Coler
Halunen Law - Minneapolis, Mn
contact info
Leonard W Aragon
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp - Phoenix
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, April 07, 2025
21 21 misc Report - Status Mon 04/07 9:11 PM
STATUS REPORT on Bankruptcy by Thomas N Crumbley. (Aragon, Leonard)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 02/07 1:40 PM
ORDER: This case will be stayed until Defendant St. Luke's Behavioral Hospital, LP, d/b/a St. Luke's Behavioral Healths bankruptcy is resolved. FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff Thomas N. Crumbley shall provide the Court with status reports every 60 days during the stay, notifying the Court with 14 days of the decision of the bankruptcy court. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/6/2025. (RMV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
19 19 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 02/04 1:14 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:18 Order,, Set Deadlines, by Plaintiff Thomas N Crumbley.(Aragon, Leonard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 01/28 4:55 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff show cause by February 4, 2025, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m) with respect to any and all Defendants not yet served in accordance with the provision of Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to show cause by that date will result in dismissal of this case with no further notice to the Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/28/2025. (RMV)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 01/28 4:49 PM
ORDER granting16 Application to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff/Relator. The Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to terminate Susan M. Coler as counsel of record for Plaintiff/Relator. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/28/2025. (RMV)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Termination/Withdrawal Mon 11/25 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Termination/Withdrawal filed by Susan M Coler.(Coler, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Withdrawal
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/30 9:57 AM
ORDER - Counts I and II of this action shall be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Relator Thomas N. Crumbley and as to the United States of America. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/29/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/29 9:44 AM
NOTICE re: Consent by United States of America re:13 Notice (Other) .(Nelson, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 25, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/25 7:04 AM
NOTICE re: of Dismissal of Counts I and II and Notice of Bankruptcy by Thomas N Crumbley . (Coler, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Mon 08/12 10:56 AM
ORDER That the complaint be unsealed and served upon the defendants by the Relator. FURTHER ORDERED All other contents of the Court's file in this action remain under seal and not be made public or served upon the defendants, except for this Order and the Government's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, which the Relator will serve upon the defendants only after service of the complaint. FURTHER ORDERTED that the seal be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. See order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/9/24. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
11 11 Notice of Election to Decline Intervention by United States of America.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Thomas N Crumbley.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet