California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 2:24-cv-06605
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Terminated:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 12:41 AM PST
Defendant
County of Los Angeles Sheriff's Department
Defendant
Sheriff P Unamed
Defendant
Sheriff O Unamed
Defendant
Sheriff M Unamed
Defendant
Sheriff L Unamed
Defendant
Megan Ngo
Defendant
Minerva Garcia
Defendant
Jasmine Garcia
Defendant
Department of Children and Family Services
Defendant
County of Los Angeles
Defendant
Judith Cohen
Defendant
Kristen Byrdsong
Defendant
Fox Blackshaw
Defendant
Eileen Aguirre
Defendant
Marla Aceves
Plaintiff
Ailena Vargas
601 South San Pedro Street
Los Angeles, CA 90014


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
6 6 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Wed 08/21 9:05 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
5 5 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Wed 08/21 9:00 AM
ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: Denying3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. This case is REMANDED to state court as explained in the attached statement. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
7 7 othcmp Amended Complaint Wed 08/21 10:38 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Notice of Removal1 , filed by Plaintiff Ailena Vargas. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Mon 08/12 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Mon 08/12 3:49 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Ailena Vargas. (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 08/12 3:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ailena Vargas (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 08/12 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of Los Angeles, case number 24CCJP00065A with Conformed copy of Petition, filed by Plaintiff Ailena Vargas. (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet