Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Jeffery P Hopkins
Referred: Stephanie K Bowman
Case #: 1:24-cv-00425
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 5:33 AM EST
Defendant
Clunk, Hoose CO. LPA
Represented By
LeAnn E Covey
Clunk Hoose Co. Lpa
contact info
Laura C. Infante
contact info
Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CMSC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2
Defendant
Hamilton County Municpal Court
Represented By
Jonathan Major Halvonik
Hamilton County Prosecutor'S Office
contact info
Bennet Scott Weaver
Hamilton County Prosecutor'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Law Office of Richard Bardach, LLC A Legal Professional Association
Represented By
LeAnn E Covey
Clunk Hoose Co. Lpa
contact info
Laura C. Infante
contact info
Defendant
Melissa E West
Represented By
Jonathan Major Halvonik
Hamilton County Prosecutor'S Office
contact info
Bennet Scott Weaver
Hamilton County Prosecutor'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Office of the Bailiff
Represented By
Jonathan Major Halvonik
Hamilton County Prosecutor'S Office
contact info
Bennet Scott Weaver
Hamilton County Prosecutor'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Richard Bardach
Represented By
LeAnn E Covey
Clunk Hoose Co. Lpa
contact info
Laura C. Infante
contact info
Defendant
Robert R Hoose
Represented By
LeAnn E Covey
Clunk Hoose Co. Lpa
contact info
Laura C. Infante
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Bank National Association As Trustt
Defendant
1-100 John and Jane Does
Plaintiff
Dwight E Jones
Plaintiff
Derryn Nicole Jones


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
29 29 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 02/18 3:35 PM
REFUSAL FOR CAUSE WITHOUT DISHONOR (c.f. U.C.C. 3-501 IN FORM OF AFFIDAVIT BY AGENTS FOR ESTATE/TRUST/ENS LEGIS DERRYN N. JONES/DERRYN JONES/DERRYN N. NESBIT AND DWIGHT E. JONES/DWIGHT EARL JONES by Plaintiffs Dwight E Jones, Derryn Nicole Jones. (eh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/14 5:00 PM
Writ of Error Order To Show Cause and Time to respond to Motion to dismiss by affidavit nunc pro tune by Plaintiffs Dwight E Jones, Derryn Nicole Jones. (eh)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/14 4:58 PM
Notice/Order/Motion For Extension of Time for Response to allege Order to Show Cause, Time to Answer Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate which is canceled/vacated and Injunction on any and all orders until writ of error is heard in Six Circuit Court of Appeals by Affidavit nunc pro tune by Plaintiffs Dwight E Jones, Derryn Nicole Jones. (eh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
26 26 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 02/07 4:33 PM
Notice, Objection to Magistrate ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Order to vacate void order and revoke and termination by affidavit by Plaintiffs Dwight E Jones, Derryn Nicole Jones. (eh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 01/24 8:27 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing on or before 2/14/2025 , why Defendants Clunk, Hoose CO. LPA, Richard Bardach, Law Office of Richard Bardach, LLC A Legal Professional Association and Robert R Hoose's Motion to Dismiss (doc.14 ) should not be construed as unopposed and granted for the reasons stated. Plaintiffs may also satisfy the requirements of this Order by filing a responsive memorandum to Defendants' motion by the 2/14/2025 deadline. Failure to timely comply with this Order will result in the pending motion being granted as unopposed for the reasons stated therein. Show Cause Response due by 2/14/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/24/2025. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/17 10:50 AM
Notice of Notice/Order for Extension of Time for Response to Report and Recommendation by unappointed Magistrate Keren L. Litkovitz until Writ of Error heard by Affidavit by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones. [DOCUMENT 24 WAS INADVERTENTLY FILED IN THE INCORRECT CASE AND HAS BEEN RESTRICTED.] (kh) Modified document text and security on 1/17/2025 (kh)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/17 10:35 AM
Writ of Error Proceeding without Authority, Consent and Jurisdiction by Affidavit Nunc Pro Tunc by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones. [DOCUMENT 23 WAS INADVERTENTLY FILED IN THE INCORRECT CASE AND HAS BEEN RESTRICTED.] (kh) Modified document text and security on 1/17/2025 (kh)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/17 10:16 AM
Writ of Error Proceeding under Magistrate judge by Affidavit by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones. (kh) (kh)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/17 9:39 AM
Notice of Notice/Order for Extension of Time for Response to14 MOTION TO DISMISS by CLUNK, HOOSE CO., LPA and Melissa E. West by Affidavit nunc pro tunc by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones. (kh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations Tue 01/14 4:35 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. The Magistrate Judge is empowered to deal with all pretrial motions and procedures, and to render a report and recommendation to the Court on any matters classified as dispositive by statute. Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 1/14/2025. (kmc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/08 9:06 AM
NOTATION ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Defendants Clunk, Hoose CO. LPA, Richard Bardach, Law Office of Richard Bardach, LLC A Legal Professional Association and Robert R Hoose's Motion for Extension of Time (doc.19 ). Defendants move the Court for an Order extending the deadline in which to respond to Plaintiffs' Writ of Discovery (doc.15 ) until 30 days from any Order denying Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss (doc.14 ). Having considered this matter, the undersigned finds Defendants' motion well taken. Accordingly, Defendants Clunk, Hoose CO. LPA, Richard Bardach, Law Office of Richard Bardach, LLC A Legal Professional Association and Robert R Hoose's motion (doc.19 ) is GRANTED and Defendants are hereby granted an extension of time in which to respond to Plaintiffs' Writ of Discovery (doc.15 ) until thirty (30) days from any Order denying Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss (doc.14 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/8/2025. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/07 3:39 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/7/2025. by Defendants Clunk, Hoose CO. LPA, Richard Bardach, Law Office of Richard Bardach, LLC A Legal Professional Association, Robert R Hoose. (Covey, LeAnn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/02 9:48 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time ONLY TO THE EXTENT that Plaintiffs are granted an extension of time through and including 1/16/2025 in which to respond to Defendants Clunk, Hoose CO. LPA, Richard Bardach, Law Office of Richard Bardach, LLC A Legal Professional Association and Robert R Hoose's Motion to Dismiss14 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 1/2/2025. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/26 4:07 PM
Notice/Order/Motion for Extension of Time for Response to Motion to Dismiss by CLUNK, HOOSE Co., LPA by Affidavit nunc pro tunc by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones. (kev)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/26 4:04 PM
Writ of Discovery for CLUNK, HOOSE CO., LPA AND ALL PARTICIPANTS AND DUTY OFFICERS Including RICHARD BARDACH AND LAW OFFICE by affidavit nuncpro tunc by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones (kev)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
16 16 misc Mail Returned Wed 12/11 8:54 AM
Mail sent to Dwight E Jones re10 Order to Show Cause returned as undeliverable (kev)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
15 15 motion Discovery Fri 12/06 4:23 PM
Writ of Discovery for Hamilton County Municipal Civil Court State of Ohio and All Participants adn Duty Officer and Affidavit by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones. (eh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 12/04 2:24 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Clunk, Hoose CO. LPA, Richard Bardach, Law Office of Richard Bardach, LLC A Legal Professional Association, Robert R Hoose. (Covey, LeAnn)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/29 3:46 PM
Writ of Error Notice of Filing the Record Motion to Dismiss by Affidavit and Notice Redeem In Lawful Money Nunc Pro Tunc by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones (bjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/20 12:05 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Melissa E West, Office of the Bailiff re3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b) (Weaver, Bennet)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
11 11 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 11/15 3:53 PM
Writ of Error Motion to Dismiss by Affidavit for show case and Notice Redeem in Lawful Money by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones. (kev)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
10 10 misc Mail Returned Tue 11/12 4:28 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable - UTF. Doc.4 sent to Derryn Nicole Jones. (eh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/29 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Major Halvonik for Defendants Melissa E West, Hamilton County Municpal Court, Office of the Bailiff (Halvonik, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Response to Motion Tue 10/29 12:09 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Strike3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b) filed by Defendants Melissa E West, Hamilton County Municpal Court, Office of the Bailiff. (Weaver, Bennet)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
7 7 motion Strike Wed 10/23 4:29 PM
NOTICE/Order/MOTION to Dismiss Document3 be Stricken from the Record for Lack of Service from the Office of the Executor(s) by Affidavit by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones. (eh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 10/23 3:53 PM
Corrected Mailing Address by Affidavit by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones (eh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 10/23 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Non-Service of Motion to Dismiss and Possible Fraud or Mistake and Corrected Mailing Address and Entry Order by Affidavit by Plaintiffs Derryn Nicole Jones, Dwight E Jones. (eh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 10/22 12:46 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing on or before 11/15/2024, why Defendants Magistrate Melissa E. West, Hamilton County Municipal Court and Office of the Bailiff, Hamilton County Sheriff's Office's Motion to Dismiss (doc.3 ) should not be construed as unopposed and granted for the reasons stated. Plaintiffs may also satisfy the requirements of this Order by filing a responsive memorandum to Defendants motion by the 11/15/2024 deadline. Failure to timely comply with this Order will result in the pending motion being granted as unopposed for the reasons stated therein. Show Cause Response due by 11/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 10/22/2024. (km)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
3 3 motion Dismiss Thu 09/26 12:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b) by Defendants Hamilton County Municpal Court, Melissa E West, Office of the Bailiff. (Weaver, Bennet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 08/13 2:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Clunk, Hoose CO. LPA, Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CMSC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2, Hamilton County Municpal Court, Law Office of Richard Bardach, LLC A Legal Professional Association, Melissa E West, Office of the Bailiff, Richard Bardach, Robert R Hoose, U.S. Bank National Association As Trustt. (bjc) (kev). Corrected summons added. Modified on test and security on 8/13/2024. (kev)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/13/2024) Main Document CORRECTED
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/13 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Clunk, Hoose CO. LPA, Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., CMSC Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2, Hamilton County Municpal Court, Law Office of Richard Bardach, LLC A Legal Professional Association, Melissa E West, Office of the Bailiff, Richard Bardach, Robert R Hoose, U.S. Bank National Association As Trustt, filed by Dwight E Jones, Derryn Jones Jones. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Filing Fee Receipt
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 08/13 2:22 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 100004353 (bjc)
Related: [-]