Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00192
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 14, 2024 3:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Edwin Rivera (1)
Represented By
Octavio Gustavo Padron
Ogpadronandassociates
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nicole M. Andrejko
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info
Noah P. Dorman
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 1:36 PM EDT
Friday, June 21, 2024
1 1 13 pgs COMPLAINT as to Edwin Rivera (1). (LDJ) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Seal Complaint and Related Documents by USA as to Edwin Rivera. (LDJ) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Seal Complaint and Related Documents as to Edwin Rivera (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 6/21/2024. (LDJ) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
Arrest of Edwin Rivera on 7/1/2024. (LDJ) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
6 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 07/01/2024 as to Edwin Rivera. (ARL) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Noah P. Dorman appearing for USA. (Dorman, Noah) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway: Initial Appearance as to Edwin Rivera held on 7/2/2024. (Digital) (LDJ) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
9 9 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Edwin Rivera. (LDJ) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Edwin Rivera. (LDJ) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act,[LINK:3:20-mc-20-TJC, Doc 1] as to Edwin Rivera: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' disclosure obligation under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to comply with that obligation. Violating this order may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and other sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. (LDJ) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORAL MOTION for Release from Custody by USA as to Edwin Rivera. (LDJ) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORAL ORDER granting 12 Oral Motion for Release from Custody as to Edwin Rivera (1). Separate order setting conditions to be entered. Rendered in open court by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 7/2/2024. (LDJ) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Edwin Rivera (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 7/2/2024. (LDJ) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
15 15 RECEIPT for surrender of Passport as to Edwin Rivera. Passport Number: A22751968. Issuing Country: United States of America. (TRF) [6:24-mj-01671-EJK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
16 16 4 pgs INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Edwin Rivera (1) count(s) 1. (JOS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment