Puerto Rico District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00244
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 14, 2024 3:17 AM AST
Defendant
Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1)
Represented By
Hector Sueiro-Alvarez
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation Office
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Maria Cristina Semanaz-Ojeda
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/14/2024 4:07 AM AST
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
Arrest of Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1). (vrg) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1).. (mg) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 *RESTRICTED* ARREST Warrant Issued by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin in case as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1). (mg) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
3 3 *RESTRICTED* CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1). (vrg) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin: Initial Appearance as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1) held on 7/10/2024. Defendant was present in court, under custody and was assisted by a certified court interpreter. AFPD Coral Rodriguez was also present in court. Defendant was provided with copy of the complaint and advised as to his rights. Also, defendant was advised of the applicable minimum and maximum statutory penalties that he is exposed to if convicted of the charges in the complaint and as to his right to consular notification. After reviewing the CJA-23 form filled by defendant, the Court deemed it appropriate to appoint counsel. Defendant will be represented by the FPD's Office. He shall remain temporarily detained pending further proceedings. Detention Hearing set for 7/12/2024 at 11:00 AM in OSJ Courtroom 4 - 3rd Floor before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Preliminary Examination set for 7/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in OSJ Courtroom 4 - 3rd Floor before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. (Court Reporter DCR.)(Hearing held in OSJ Courtroom 4.)Hearing held at 04:47.Hearing ended at 04:49.Interpreter Elle Dowd. (vrg) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 7/10/2024.(vrg) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER scheduling detention hearing as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1). Defendant is TEMPORARILY DETAINED pending hearing. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 7/10/2024.(vrg) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Hector Sueiro-Alvarez appearing for Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1) (Sueiro-Alvarez, Hector) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
8 8 ***SELECTED PARTIES***Notice of Disclosure of Pretrial Services Report as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1). Pretrial Services Reports are made available to Defense Counsel and the Government. The Pretrial Reports are not public record, are not to be produced or disclosed to any other party, and shall remain confidential as provided in Title 18 U.S.C. 3153(c)(1), by USA, US Probation Office, Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (Nunez Diaz, Naysha) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Maria Cristina Semanaz-Ojeda appearing for USA. (Semanaz-Ojeda, Maria) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Antonio Perez-Alonso by USA as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1). Responses due by 7/26/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Alonso, Antonio) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE Revoking Waiver of Rights and Revoking Consent to the Search and Seizure of any Property as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1) (Sueiro-Alvarez, Hector) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin: Detention Hearing as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1) held on 7/12/2024. Present were AUSA Antonio L. Perez, AFPD Hector Sueiro and USPO Emanuel Bravo. The defendant was present, under custody and assisted by a certified court interpreter. Defense counsel argued in favor of setting conditions of release. Government moved and proffered with an exhibit for detention. After hearing the arguments of the parties, the Court held the matter under advisement. Exhibits admitted: Government's Exhibit 1. (Court Reporter DCR.)(Hearing held in OSJ Courtroom 4.)Hearing set for 11:00.Hearing held at 11:17.Hearing ended at 11:31.Interpreter Iris Ramirez. (vrg) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
13 13 EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1) re: 12 Detention Hearing.(vrg) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
14 14 ORDER granting10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. AUSA Antonio L. Perez-Alonso withdrawn from case as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 7/17/2024. (bgl) [3:24-mj-00638-BJM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
15 15 INDICTMENT as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1) count(s) 1, 2. (arg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NPV Indictment
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez: Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to Jose Luis Ortiz-Albert (1) held on 7/18/2024. Arraignment set for 7/31/2024 09:00 AM in Hato Rey Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez. Defendant under custody. Marshal to produce defendant.(Court Reporter DCR.)(Hearing held in OSJ Courtroom 6.) (arg)
Related: [-]