Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Mark Pittman
Case #: 4:24-cv-00767
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Case in other court:New York Eastern, 1:24-cv-01927
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 4:26 AM CST
Defendant
Gregory McCabe
Represented By
Colin Patrick Benton
Wick Phillips Gould Martin LLP
contact info
Paul Thomas Elkins
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David J Drez, III
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Brda
Represented By
Jason M Hopkins
Dla Piper
contact info
Jason S Lewis
Dla Piper
contact info
Ryan D Lantry
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Defendant
Kristin Whitley
Represented By
Colin Patrick Benton
Wick Phillips Gould Martin LLP
contact info
Paul Thomas Elkins
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David J Drez, III
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mia Pitts
Represented By
Colin Patrick Benton
Wick Phillips Gould Martin LLP
contact info
Paul Thomas Elkins
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David J Drez, III
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Defendant
George Palikaras
Defendant
Delvina Oelkers
Represented By
Colin Patrick Benton
Wick Phillips Gould Martin LLP
contact info
Paul Thomas Elkins
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David J Drez, III
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Next Bridge Hydrocarbons, Inc.
Represented By
Colin Patrick Benton
Wick Phillips Gould Martin LLP
contact info
Paul Thomas Elkins
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David J Drez, III
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lucas T. Hawkins
Represented By
Colin Patrick Benton
Wick Phillips Gould Martin LLP
contact info
Paul Thomas Elkins
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David J Drez, III
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Clifton Dubose, Jr.
Represented By
Colin Patrick Benton
Wick Phillips Gould Martin LLP
contact info
Paul Thomas Elkins
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David J Drez, III
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert L. Cook
Represented By
Colin Patrick Benton
Wick Phillips Gould Martin LLP
contact info
Paul Thomas Elkins
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David J Drez, III
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
David Lattimore Evans
David L. Evans
contact info
Movant
Steven Martinez
Represented By
Stuart L Cochran
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg PLLC
contact info
Adam M Apton
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Shayne Daniel Moses
Moses Palmer & Howell
contact info
Movant
Mohammed Limon
Represented By
Stuart L Cochran
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg PLLC
contact info
Adam M Apton
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Shayne Daniel Moses
Moses Palmer & Howell
contact info
Plaintiff
Todd Targgart
Represented By
Stuart L Cochran
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg PLLC
contact info
Adam M Apton
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Shayne Daniel Moses
Moses Palmer & Howell
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ken Rice
Terminated: 09/11/2024
Defendant
Joseph DeWoody
Terminated: 09/11/2024
Represented By
Colin Patrick Benton
Wick Phillips Gould Martin LLP
contact info
Paul Thomas Elkins
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David J Drez, III
Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Inter-Coastal Waterways, LLC
Terminated: 09/11/2024
5 Seafarers Circle
Savannah, GA 31411
Represented By
Mark R Basile
The Basile Law Firm PC
contact info
Movant
Craig Brown
Terminated: 09/11/2024
Represented By
Phillip Kim
The Rosen Law Firm PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, December 16, 2024
65 65 429 pgs respm Appendix in Support Mon 12/16 5:13 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Mia Pitts, Kristin Whitley, Gregory McCabe, Next Bridge Hydrocarbons, Inc., Robert L. Cook, Clifton Dubose, Jr, Joseph DeWoody, Lucas T. Hawkins, Delvina Oelkers re64 Reply (Benton, Colin)
Related: [-]
64 64 14 pgs respm Reply Mon 12/16 5:11 PM
REPLY filed by Mia Pitts, Kristin Whitley, Gregory McCabe, Next Bridge Hydrocarbons, Inc., Robert L. Cook, Clifton Dubose, Jr, Joseph DeWoody, Lucas T. Hawkins, Delvina Oelkers re:49 MOTION to Dismiss (Benton, Colin)
Related: [-]