Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Case #: 1:24-cv-23094
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, January 06, 2025
11 11 6 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 01/06 10:36 PM
ORDER Dismissing Petition / Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/6/2025. See attached document for full details. (jgz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
10 10 6 pgs misc Memorandum Thu 11/21 12:44 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support Petition for Habeas Corpus by Brent Borland. (Pepin, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
9 9 7 pgs misc Memorandum Wed 10/09 11:13 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re8 Claim, Memorandum,7 Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause,1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by Brent Borland. (Pepin, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
8 8 7 pgs misc Memorandum Claim Thu 09/12 10:05 AM
CLAIM, MEMORANDUM in Support re7 Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause,1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by Brent Borland.(Pepin, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
7 7 15 pgs misc Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause Tue 09/03 1:48 PM
REPLY to6 Response to Order to Show Cause, by Brent Borland. (Pepin, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
6 6 7 pgs misc Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 08/28 5:15 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re4 Order to Show Cause by Warden FCI Miami.(Montes, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Sentence Computation Data,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration on Exhaustion,
Att: 3 Exhibit RRC Referral,
Att: 4 Exhibit Inmate History Data,
Att: 5 Exhibit FSA Time Credit Assessment
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 08/28 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Montes on behalf of Warden FCI Miami. Attorney Andrea Montes added to party Warden FCI Miami(pty:res). (Montes, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 08/14 6:37 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Respondent shall show cause why the requested relief should not be granted on or before August 28, 2024. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/14/2024. See attached document for full details. (mei)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 08/14 1:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Warden FCI Miami. (ar24)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Wed 08/14 1:09 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 08/14 9:49 AM
APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17755485, filed by Brent Borland.(Pepin, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 1 pgs Summon(s),
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit 1 - Bureau of Prisons 2023 Annual Report,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit 2 - First Step Act Admission and Orientation Addendum November 20, 2023,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit 3 - Petitioner Graphical Depiction,
Att: 6 6 pgs Exhibit 4 - Navarro BOP Report,
Att: 7 3 pgs Exhibit 5 - BOP Admin Memo,
Att: 8 8 pgs Exhibit 6 - FPC Miami Unit Team Emails with Petitioner