Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth D Katz
Case #: 3:24-bk-30411
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Dismissed:Aug 27, 2024
Terminated:Sep 16, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
TCI Holdings, LLC
64 Bartlett Ave
Pittsfield, MA 01201-6302
Represented By
Andrea M. O'Connor
Fitzgerald Law, PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King
Office of the U. S. Trustee 446 Main Street 14th Floor
Worcester, MA 01608


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, September 16, 2024
court Close Bankruptcy Case (Ch.11 Only) Mon 09/16 8:49 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (pf)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Sat 09/14 7:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Related [+] Notice Date 09/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Notice of Dismissal
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 09/11 11:27 AM
Order dated 9/11/2024 Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC. IN LIGHT OF THE DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE BY ORDER OF AUGUST 26, 2024, THE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR OCTOBER 10, 2024 IS CANCELED. (pf)
Related: [-]
26 26 crt_gen Notice of Dismissal Wed 09/11 8:45 AM
Notice of Dismissal For Failure to File Other Documents. (pf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral Wed 08/28 10:37 AM
Endorsed Order dated 8/28/2024 Re:10 Emergency Motion filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC for Use of Cash Collateral. MOOT. THIS CASE HAS BEEN DISMISSED. SEE ORDER OF AUGUST 26, 2024 [DOCKET #24]. THE HEARING ON THIS MOTION SET FOR TODAY, AUGUST 28, 2024 IS CANCELED. (pf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Mon 08/26 4:45 PM
Corrected Endorsed Order dated 8/26/2024 Re:22 Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Dismiss Case. GRANTED, EFFECTIVE 4:00 P.M. ON AUGUST 27, 2024, UNLESS THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE, UPON RECEIPT OF PROOF OF SATISFACTORY INSURANCE, FILES A WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRUSTEES MOTION TO DISMISS PRIOR TO THAT TIME. THE DEBTOR MAY FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THIS ORDER, WITHIN 14 DAYS OF ITS ENTRY, IN THE EVENT THAT THE DEBTOR OBTAINS SATISFACTORY INSURANCE WITHIN THAT TIME. (pf)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Mon 08/26 4:21 PM
Endorsed Order dated 8/26/2024 Re:22 Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Dismiss Case. GRANTED, EFFECTIVE 4:00 P.M. ON AUGUST 27, 2024, UNLESS THE CHAPTER 13 TRUSTEE, UPON RECEIPT OF PROOF OF SATISFACTORY INSURANCE, FILES A WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRUSTEES MOTION TO DISMISS PRIOR TO THAT TIME. THE DEBTOR MAY FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THIS ORDER, WITHIN 14 DAYS OF ITS ENTRY, IN THE EVENT THAT THE DEBTOR OBTAINS SATISFACTORY INSURANCE WITHIN THAT TIME. (pf)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss Case Mon 08/26 4:02 PM
Emergency Motion filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King to Dismiss Case with certificate of service. (Tingue, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/23 7:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Generic PDF
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
20 20 utility Generic PDF Tue 08/20 10:06 AM
Copy of18 Corrected17 Order dated 8/19/2024 Setting (A) Status Conference; (B) Claims Bar Date; (C) Deadline for Election Under 11 U.S.C. § 1111(b); and (D) Other Deadlines sent to all creditors. (pf)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/20 10:04 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-] 18 Amended Order
Monday, August 19, 2024
18 18 order Amended Order Tue 08/20 9:21 AM
Corrected17 Order dated 8/19/2024 Setting (A) Status Conference; (B) Claims Bar Date; (C) Deadline for Election Under 11 U.S.C. § 1111(b); and (D) Other Deadlines Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 10/10/2024 at 11:00 AM at Springfield Courtroom - Berkshire. The report required by 11 U.S.C. § 1188(c) due by 9/19/2024. See Order for Full Text. (pf)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC
17 17 order Scheduling Order(Only Use for Subchapter V cases) Mon 08/19 3:19 PM
Order dated 8/19/2024 Setting (A) Status Conference; (B) Claims Bar Date; (C) Deadline for Election Under 11 U.S.C. § 1111(b); and (D) Other Deadlines Related [+]. Status Conference to be held on 10/10/2024 at 11:00 AM at Springfield Courtroom - Berkshire. The report required by 11 U.S.C. § 1188(c) due by 9/19/2024. See Order for Full Text. (pf)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC
16 16 misc Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Mon 08/19 11:03 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Cash Collateral
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Mon 08/19 9:11 AM
Endorsed Order dated 8/19/2024 Re:11 Motion filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEBTOR TO FILE THE MISSING DOCUMENTS IS EXTENDED TO SEPTEMBER 5, 2024. (pf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 18, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Mon 08/19 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] Notice Date 08/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Court's Notice of 341 sent - 11 Corporation
Friday, August 16, 2024
13 13 crt_gen Court's Notice of 341 Sent 11 Corporation Fri 08/16 5:06 PM
Court's Notice of 341 sent. (sas)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order To Set Hearing Fri 08/16 4:56 PM
Order dated 8/16/2024 Re:10 Emergency Motion filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC for Use of Cash Collateral. Hearing scheduled for 8/28/2024 at 02:00 PM by video. See Order for Full Text. (sas)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extend Time Fri 08/16 3:57 PM
Motion filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)] with certificate of service. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Cash Collateral Fri 08/16 3:31 PM
Emergency Motion filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC for Use of Cash Collateral with certificate of service and proposed order. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Fri 08/16 5:06 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/9/2024 at 11:00 AM as Telephonic Meeting. Proofs of Claims due by 10/23/2024. (sas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
9 9 5 pgs trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Thu 08/15 4:18 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee . Stephen Darr added to the case. (Tingue, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/14 2:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lisa D. Tingue with certificate of service filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King (Tingue, Lisa)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/14 1:46 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers by David A. Lavenburg Esq. with certificate of service filed by Creditor Pinnacle Financial Services, LLC (Lavenburg, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order to Update Wed 08/14 1:10 PM
Order to Update. Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations and Small Business Tax Return Date: 8/21/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Atty Disclosure Statement, Schedules A-H, Statement of Financial Affairs and Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 8/28/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 8/28/2024. (sas)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 08/14 9:55 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11),2 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors,3 Equity Security Holders
4 4 court Matrix Wed 08/14 9:54 AM
Matrix filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Equity Security Holders Wed 08/14 9:53 AM
Equity Security Holders filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 08/14 9:52 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders filed by Debtor TCI Holdings, LLC (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 08/14 9:49 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubchapterV Non-Individual. with deficiencies. Filing Fee in the Amount of $1738 Filed by TCI Holdings, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V due by 11/12/2024. (O'Connor, Andrea)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 08/14 9:51 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-30411 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt Number A20600428, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1