North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Frank D Whitney
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:24-cv-00743
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
Christopher Behrmann
Defendant
Does 1 - 10
Plaintiff
Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Jonathan Todt
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
16 16 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Wed 04/23 4:49 PM
Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Gallagher, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 2:43 PM
ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Jessica L. Gallagher for Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/17/2025. (add)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/17 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Saunders on behalf of Christopher Behrmann (Saunders, Courtney)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Thu 04/17 1:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jessica L. Gallagher Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6939415. by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Todt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Thu 04/17 2:43 PM
Notice to Jessica L. Gallagher: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 4/24/2025. (add)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Wed 04/02 3:15 PM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 4/23/2025. (clc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/26 5:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Christopher Behrmann.(Magee, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Death Certificates,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Missouri Probate File
Monday, February 24, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 02/24 2:16 PM
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Christopher Behrmann answer due 3/26/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/24/2025. (brl)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time Fri 02/21 4:34 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint, by Christopher Behrmann. (Magee, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
9 9 service Service by Publication Mon 02/10 10:04 PM
SERVICE by Publication filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Last publication date January 31, 2025.(Todt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Publication
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 11/13 3:18 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 6 Amended Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. Plaintiff shall effectuate service upon Defendant Christopher Behrmann on or before February 10, 2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/13/24. (mga)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 11/13 8:47 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. Plaintiff shall effectuate service upon Defendant Christopher Behrmann on or before February 10, 2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/12/24. (mga)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time Tue 11/12 9:18 PM
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Todt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Due Diligence,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Waiver of Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Complaint Correspondence
5 5 motion Extension of Time Tue 11/12 1:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Todt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 15, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/15 7:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Todt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 08/14 12:31 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Christopher Behrmann. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cjs)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Citizenship Disclosure Statement Wed 08/14 10:42 AM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Todt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 08/14 10:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Christopher Behrmann ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6629301), filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company.(Todt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Annuity,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Overpayment Correspondence,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Letters,
Att: 4 Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/14 10:55 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (cjs)
Related: [-]
utility Initial Scheduling Order Entry - Judge Whitney Wed 08/14 10:56 AM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Initial Scheduling Order] and[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form] pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (cjs)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Wed 08/14 11:16 AM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (cjs)
Related: [-]