Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Colin Stirling Bruce
Referred: Eric I Long
Case #: 1:24-cv-01284
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Case in other court:McLean County Circuit Court, 2024CH000014
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 2:17 AM CST
Defendant
Board of Trustees of Illinois State University
in their official capacities Illinois State University 309 Hovey Hall
Normal, IL 61790
Represented By
Kathryn Leigh Johnson-Monfort
Heyl Royster Voelker & Allen
contact info
Brian Michael Smith
Heyl Royster Voelker & Allen
contact info
Defendant
Illinois State University
309 Hovey Hall
Normal, IL 61790
Represented By
Kathryn Leigh Johnson-Monfort
Heyl Royster Voelker & Allen
contact info
Brian Michael Smith
Heyl Royster Voelker & Allen
contact info
Defendant
Robert Andrew Morgan
Normal, IL 61761
Represented By
Sarah Hughes Newman
Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Aondover Tarhule
in his official capacity as President of the Illinois State University Illinois State University 309 Hovey Hall
Normal, IL 61790
Represented By
Sarah Hughes Newman
Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Bloom-Boedefeld
Represented By
Sheryl Melanie Weikal
Sheryl Weikal, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Dion
Represented By
Sheryl Melanie Weikal
Sheryl Weikal, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Kimball
Represented By
Sheryl Melanie Weikal
Sheryl Weikal, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Lazaroff
Represented By
Sheryl Melanie Weikal
Sheryl Weikal, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebekah Mangels
Represented By
Sheryl Melanie Weikal
Sheryl Weikal, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Aidan Marcikic
Represented By
Sheryl Melanie Weikal
Sheryl Weikal, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jomareun Richardson
Represented By
Sheryl Melanie Weikal
Sheryl Weikal, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/24 10:24 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/24/2025. Defendants' Motion to Stay39 , Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order40 , and Defendants' Motion to Join41 are all GRANTED for the reasons stated therein. Discovery is hereby stayed pending resolution of the pending motions to dismiss.(BMG)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
41 41 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/21 3:41 PM
MOTION to Join re39 MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines Pending Resolution of Dispositive Motions and Response (No Opposition) to Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (Dkt. 40) by Defendants Robert Andrew Morgan, Aondover Tarhule. Responses due by 3/7/2025 (Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
40 40 motion Amend/Correct Stay Thu 02/20 11:29 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct25 Order,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,,, Modify Scheduling Order , MOTION to Stay Amended Pleading Deadline by Plaintiffs Joseph Bloom-Boedefeld, Kevin Dion, Daniel Kimball, Steven Lazaroff, Rebekah Mangels, Aidan Marcikic, Jomareun Richardson. Responses due by 3/6/2025 (Weikal, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Stay Thu 02/20 11:03 AM
MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines Pending Resolution of Dispositive Motions by Defendants Board of Trustees of Illinois State University, Illinois State University. Responses due by 3/6/2025 (Johnson-Monfort, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
38 38 respm Response to Motion/Petition Tue 01/14 10:35 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Robert Andrew Morgan, Aondover Tarhule. (BMG)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 01/14 10:34 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 1/14/2025. Defendants Andrew Morgan and Aondover Tarhule's Motion for Leave to File Reply37 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to docket the proposed Reply (#37-1) as Defendants Morgan and Tarhule's Reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss26 . (BMG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
37 37 motion Leave to File Document Thu 01/09 3:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Robert Andrew Morgan, Aondover Tarhule. Responses due by 1/23/2025(Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Individual Defendants' proposed reply in support of their motion to dismiss
Monday, December 30, 2024
36 36 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/30 10:45 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Board of Trustees of Illinois State University. (BMG)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 12/30 10:44 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/30/2024. Defendants The Board of Trustees of Illinois State University and Illinois State University's Motion for Leave to File a Reply35 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to docket the attached proposed Reply (#35-1) as those Defendants' Reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss. (BMG)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
35 35 motion Leave to File Document Fri 12/20 12:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Combined Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Defendants Board of Trustees of Illinois State University, Illinois State University. Responses due by 1/3/2025(Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/20 11:12 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/20/2024. Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Seek Leave to File Reply Brief34 is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion for Leave to Reply will be due by January 9, 2025. As Defendants acknowledge in their Motion, Local Rule 7.1(B)(3) mandates that Defendants' proposed Reply be attached to their Motion for Leave to Reply. (BMG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
34 34 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 12/19 12:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion for leave to file reply (unopposed) by Defendants Robert Andrew Morgan, Aondover Tarhule. Responses due by 1/2/2025 (Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
33 33 respm Response to Motion/Petition Thu 12/12 5:16 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bloom-Boedefeld, Daniel Kimball, Jomareun Richardson, Kevin Dion, Rebekah Mangels, Aidan Marcikic, Steven Lazaroff. (Weikal, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/09 9:53 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/9/2024. Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time32 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' responses to the pending Motions to Dismiss are due by December 13, 2024. (BMG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/05 12:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, Set/Reset Deadlines: by Plaintiffs Joseph Bloom-Boedefeld, Daniel Kimball, Jomareun Richardson, Kevin Dion, Rebekah Mangels, Aidan Marcikic, Steven Lazaroff. Responses due by 12/19/2024 (Weikal, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 11/15 12:15 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 11/15/2024. Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time31 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Responses to the currently pending Motions to Dismiss will be due by December 6, 2024. (BMG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 11/14 3:28 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to28 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,,26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of First Amended Complaint Unopposed by Plaintiffs Joseph Bloom-Boedefeld, Daniel Kimball, Jomareun Richardson, Kevin Dion, Rebekah Mangels, Aidan Marcikic, Steven Lazaroff. Responses due by 11/29/2024 (Weikal, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
30 30 misc Sealed Document + Fri 11/01 4:44 PM
+++ SEALED DOCUMENT..(Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Seal Fri 11/01 4:41 PM
MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) by Defendants Robert Andrew Morgan, Aondover Tarhule. Responses due by 11/15/2024 (Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
28 28 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion/Petition Fri 11/01 4:37 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendants Robert Andrew Morgan, Aondover Tarhule.(Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, Mangels Disposition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, Lazaroff Disposition,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, Kimball Disposition,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, Dion Disposition,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, Bloom-Boedefeld Disposition,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, Marcikic Disposition,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, Richardson Disposition,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, May 7, 2024 25News Now article re protest,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, May 3, 2024 Warning,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, ISU Policy 6.1.1,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, ISU Policy 6.1.10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, May 3, 2024 Interim Suspension Notice,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, Kimball Housing Agreement (filed under seal),
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, Housing Cancellation Notice (filed under seal),
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, May 15, 2024 letter from Reed to Kimball (filed under seal),
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, May 15, 2024 letter from Reed to Bloom-Boedefeld (filed under seal),
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, May 17, 2024 letter from Reed to Richardson (filed under seal),
Att: 18 Exhibit 18, May 15, 2024 letter from Reed to Dion (filed under seal),
Att: 19 Exhibit 19, May 15, 2024 letter from Reed to Lazaroff (filed under seal),
Att: 20 Exhibit 20, May 15, 2024 letter from Reed to Marcikic (filed under seal),
Att: 21 Exhibit 21, May 15, 2024 letter from Reed to Mangels (filed under seal),
Att: 22 Exhibit 22, Sample UHP Decision Letter dated June 24, 2024,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23, ISU Code of Student Conduct,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24, Mangels Enrollment Verification Report,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25, Jan. 2, 2023 Illinois State News article re Dr. Andy Morgan
27 27 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 11/01 4:22 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of First Amended Complaint by Defendants Board of Trustees of Illinois State University, Illinois State University. Responses due by 11/15/2024(Johnson-Monfort, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
26 26 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 11/01 4:17 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Robert Andrew Morgan, Aondover Tarhule. Responses due by 11/15/2024 (Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
25 25 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 10/24 3:18 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/24/2024. The court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/24. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting24 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 2/20/25, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 2/20/25, Plaintiff's deadline to disclose experts 8/15/25, Plaintiff's deadline to provide expert reports is 9/18/25, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 10/22/25, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts is 11/19/25, Defendant's deadline to provide expert reports is 12/19/25, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 1/21/26, discovery closes 2/16/26, case dispositive motions due 3/16/26. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/26 at 10:30 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 8/4/26 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 8/14/25 at 10:15 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 551-285-1373, then enter meeting ID 160 924 96574.(JMB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
24 24 misc Discovery Plan - Proposed/Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 10/23 4:11 PM
DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Board of Trustees of Illinois State University. (Johnson-Monfort, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Mon 10/21 9:50 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/21/2024. Pursuant to the Court's Text Order enterned on 10/15/24, Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal11 is denied as moot with leave to refile. (BMG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 10/15 9:13 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/15/2024. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(E), due to the filing of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint23 , Defendants' Motion to Dismiss10 is denied as moot with leave to refile. (BMG)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/11 10:39 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevin Dion, Daniel Kimball, Rebekah Mangels, Steven Lazaroff, Aidan Marcikic, Joseph Bloom-Boedefeld, Jomareun Richardson.(Weikal, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 09/23 10:27 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/23/2024. The parties' Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines Regarding the Current Complaint and Set Deadlines for Amended Complaint22 is GRANTED. The Individual Defendants' deadline to respond to the original Complaint, and Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the Board Defendants' current Motion to Dismiss, is extended to 10/18/24. If Plaintiffs file an amended complaint on or before 10/11/24, Defendants are given until 11/1/24 to respond to the amended complaint.(BMG)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
22 22 motion Stay Fri 09/20 3:35 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay deadlines regarding the current complaint and set deadlines for responding to amended complaint on behalf of all parties by Defendants Robert Andrew Morgan, Aondover Tarhule. Responses due by 10/4/2024 (Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
21 21 21 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Rule 16) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/18 2:20 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/18/2024. This matter is scheduled for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by personal appearance before U.S. Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on October 30, 2024, at 9:45 a.m. , Courtroom B, U.S. Courthouse, 201 South Vine Street, Urbana, Illinois. If an agreed discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) is filed seven days before the hearing, the Court will adopt the schedule and vacate the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (RAH)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 09/18 2:15 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/18/2024. Defendants Aondover Tarhule and Andrew Morgan's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time19 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants Tarhule and Morgan to answer or otherwise response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 9/20/24. In addition, Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint20 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are directed to file their First Amended Complaint by 10/11/24. In the future, if filing a document requires the Court's leave, Plaintiffs must attach the proposed document as an exhibit to the motion to file. Civil LR 7.1(F). (RAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
20 20 motion Amend/Correct Tue 09/17 3:25 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by October 11, 2024 by Plaintiffs Joseph Bloom-Boedefeld, Kevin Dion, Daniel Kimball, Steven Lazaroff, Rebekah Mangels, Aidan Marcikic, Jomareun Richardson. Responses due by 10/1/2024 (Weikal, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/06 5:13 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Defendants Robert Andrew Morgan, Aondover Tarhule. Responses due by 9/20/2024 (Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Sealed Document + Fri 09/06 3:04 PM
+++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Sealed Document + Fri 09/06 3:04 PM
+++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Sealed Document + Fri 09/06 3:03 PM
+++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Sealed Document + Fri 09/06 3:03 PM
+++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Sealed Document + Fri 09/06 3:02 PM
+++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Sealed Document + Fri 09/06 3:02 PM
+++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Sealed Document + Fri 09/06 3:01 PM
+++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Leave to File Document Under Seal Fri 09/06 2:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Exhibits A-G to Motion to Dismiss) by Defendants Board of Trustees of Illinois State University, Illinois State University. Responses due by 9/20/2024 (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 09/06 2:56 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants Board of Trustees of Illinois State University, Illinois State University. Responses due by 9/20/2024 (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
9 9 12 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Mon 08/26 10:46 AM
ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/26/2024. Plaintiff's Petition for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction6 is DENIED. See written Order. (BMG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/21 9:49 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/21/2024. Defendants Robert Morgan and Aondover Tarhule's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time7 and Defendants Board of Trustees of Illinois State University and Illinois State University's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time8 are both GRANTED. The deadline for all Defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 9/6/24.(BMG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 08/20 4:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants Board of Trustees of Illinois State University, Illinois State University. Responses due by 9/3/2024 (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 08/20 3:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Defendants Robert Andrew Morgan, Aondover Tarhule. Responses due by 9/3/2024 (Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
6 6 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 08/15 1:17 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Joseph Bloom-Boedefeld, Kevin Dion, Daniel Kimball, Steven Lazaroff, Rebekah Mangels, Aidan Marcikic, Jomareun Richardson. Responses due by 8/29/2024 (Weikal, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 08/15 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sheryl Melanie Weikal on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weikal, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 08/15 9:22 AM
TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL entered by Judge James E. Shadid. Judge Shadid disqualifies and recuses himself from participation in this matter. This matter is referred to Chief Judge Darrow for reassignment. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/15/2024. (CG)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Thu 08/15 12:46 PM
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/15/24. This case and the corresponding hearings are reassigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow pending reassignment. (TK)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Thu 08/15 12:49 PM
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/15/24. This case and the corresponding hearings are reassigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce and Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long for further proceedings. (TK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 08/14 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kathryn Leigh Johnson-Monfort on behalf of Board of Trustees of Illinois State University, Illinois State University (Johnson-Monfort, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 08/14 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian Michael Smith on behalf of Board of Trustees of Illinois State University, Illinois State University (Smith, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 08/14 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Sarah Hughes Newman on behalf of Robert Andrew Morgan, Aondover Tarhule (Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Attorney Notice of Removal Wed 08/14 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McLean County Circuit Court, case number 2024CH000014 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4539749), filed by Aondover Tarhule, Robert Andrew Morgan.(Newman, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, Complaint in Richardson, et. al., v. Morgan, et al., No. 2024CH000014 (McLean Cty. Cir. Ct.),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, Declaration of Robert Andrew Morgan,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, Declaration of Aondover Tarhule Regarding Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, Declaration of Aondover Tarhule on behalf of the Board of Trustees of Illinois State University,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, Summons and Complaint served on Robert Andrew Morgan,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, Summons and Complaint served on Aondover Tarhule,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, Plaintiffs' Verified Petition for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, Notice of Motion re Plaintiffs' Petition for TRO or PI (Ex. 7)