Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Margaret R Guzman
Case #: 4:24-cv-40107
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
IBA, Inc.
Represented By
Robert J. Gilbertson
Forsgren Fisher
contact info
James A. Vevone, Jr.
Seder & Chandler
contact info
Caitlinrose H. Fisher
Forsgren Fisher
contact info
Defendant
Webco Chemical Corporation
Represented By
John LeBlanc
Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP
contact info
Christine K. Bush
Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ecolab Inc.
Represented By
Rachel Zimmerman Scobie
Merchant & Gould P.C.
contact info
Bryan Harrison
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Kevin R. Mosier
Sunstein LLP
contact info
Lisa M. Tittemore
Sunstein LLP
contact info
Marra Mancina Clay
Merchant & Gould
contact info
Paige Stradley
Merchant & Gould
contact info
Plaintiff
Ecolab USA Inc.
Represented By
Rachel Zimmerman Scobie
Merchant & Gould P.C.
contact info
Bryan Harrison
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Kevin R. Mosier
Sunstein LLP
contact info
Lisa M. Tittemore
Sunstein LLP
contact info
Marra Mancina Clay
Merchant & Gould
contact info
Paige Stradley
Merchant & Gould
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
44 44 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Fri 05/02 4:22 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion30 MOTION to Dismiss ,27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester (In person only) before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman. (SF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
43 43 respm Sur-reply to Motion Fri 12/20 3:06 PM
SUR-REPLY to Motion re30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc.. (Mosier, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
42 42 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Wed 12/11 5:04 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting41 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to IBA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on December 11, 2024 - in the caption of the document. (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
41 41 motion Leave to File Document Tue 12/10 5:18 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to IBA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc..(Mosier, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
40 40 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/09 10:35 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Webco Chemical Corporation. (LeBlanc, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/06 4:01 PM
REPLY to Response to27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Webco Chemical Corporation. (LeBlanc, John)
Related: [-]
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/06 3:35 PM
REPLY to Response to30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by IBA, Inc.. (Gilbertson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
37 37 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Thu 12/05 2:08 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting36 MOTION for Leave to File Replies In Support of Motions to Dismiss. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
36 36 motion Leave to File Document Wed 11/27 12:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Replies In Support of Motions to Dismiss by IBA, Inc., Webco Chemical Corporation.(LeBlanc, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
35 35 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 11/22 4:13 PM
Opposition re30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc..(Mosier, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 R. Scobie Declaration ISO Opposition,
Att: 2 Ex. 1 to Scobie Declaration
34 34 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 11/22 4:09 PM
Opposition re27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc.. (Mosier, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
33 33 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 11/14 9:07 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting32 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to30 MOTION to Dismiss ,27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 11/08 6:02 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to30 MOTION to Dismiss ,27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc..(Mosier, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
31 31 22 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 11/01 3:40 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by IBA, Inc.. (Gilbertson, Robert)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Dismiss Fri 11/01 3:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by IBA, Inc..(Gilbertson, Robert)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Declaration Fri 11/01 2:50 PM
DECLARATION re27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Webco Chemical Corporation.(Bush, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
28 28 24 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 11/01 2:44 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Webco Chemical Corporation. (Bush, Christine)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 11/01 2:43 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Webco Chemical Corporation.(Bush, Christine)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 11/01 2:38 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
25 25 misc Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 10/31 4:19 PM
Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Mosier, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
24 24 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/04 10:20 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IBA, Inc.. (Vevone, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlinrose H. Fisher on behalf of IBA, Inc. (Fisher, Caitlinrose)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Gilbertson on behalf of IBA, Inc. (Gilbertson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 09/24 5:03 PM
Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert J. Gilbertson and Caitlinrose H. Fisher. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/24 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marra Mancina Clay on behalf of Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc. (Clay, Marra)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/24 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Stradley on behalf of Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc. (Stradley, Paige)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/24 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Zimmerman Scobie on behalf of Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc. (Scobie, Rachel)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/24 12:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert J. Gilbertson and Caitlinrose H. Fisher Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number AMADC-10614598 by IBA, Inc..(Vevone, James)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 09/24 11:47 AM
Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting15 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint extending time to November 1, 2024 for IBA, Inc. and Webco Chemical Corporation to File Answer re1 Complaint by Ecolab Inc. and Ecolab USA Inc. Answers due 11/01/2024. (Hatheway, Julia)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
15 15 misc Stipulation Mon 09/23 4:01 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Webco Chemical Corporation. (LeBlanc, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Mon 09/23 10:33 AM
Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rachel Scobie, Marra M. Clay, and Paige Stradley. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/18 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Vevone, Jr on behalf of IBA, Inc. (Vevone, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/18 12:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rachel Scobie, Marra M. Clay, and Paige Stradley Filing fee: $ 375, receipt number AMADC-10606090 by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc..(Mosier, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/17 10:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed IBA, Inc. served on 9/11/2024, answer due 10/2/2024. (Mosier, Kevin)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/17 10:18 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Webco Chemical Corporation served on 9/11/2024, answer due 10/2/2024. (Mosier, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/17 7:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John LeBlanc on behalf of Webco Chemical Corporation (LeBlanc, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/16 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christine K. Bush on behalf of Webco Chemical Corporation (Bush, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 09/10 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Bryan Harrison (Harrison, Bryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/10 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin R. Mosier on behalf of Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc. (Mosier, Kevin)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 09/10 4:35 PM
Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered. Attorney Bryan Harrison terminated.(King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/14 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Tittemore on behalf of Ecolab Inc. (Tittemore, Lisa)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 08/14 1:56 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Wed 08/14 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/14 12:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc.. (Harrison, Bryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 08/14 12:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10554211 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ecolab Inc., Ecolab USA Inc..(Harrison, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Category Form Category Form,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet