Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Case #: 3:24-cv-01360
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 4:32 AM AST
Consol Defendant
Thyssenkrupp Materials Trading GMBH
Consol Defendant
Thyssenkrupp AG
Consol Defendant
ThyssenKrupp Materials N.A., Inc.
Consol Defendant
Steel Services & Supplies, Inc.
Consol Defendant
Edgardo Sola-Colon
Consol Defendant
Norbert Goertz
Consol Defendant
Ralf Gendruschke
Consol Defendant
Francis Garcia-Haghverdian
Consol Defendant
Co-Conspirator Entities A through Z
Consol Defendant
Carolina Building Materials, Inc.
Consol Defendant
Carolina Building LLC
Consol Defendant
Juan C. Aponte-Tolentino
Consol Defendant
Aceros de America, Inc.
Consol Plaintiff
IZQ Construction LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth McKenna
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Michael Acciavatti
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info
Peggy Wedgworth
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Luis Valiente Almeida-Olivieri
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Thyssenkrupp Materials N.A., Inc.
Represented By
Elena M. Olivieri
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez
Mcconnell Valdes, LLC
contact info
Douglas Litvack
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thyssenkrupp Materials Trading GMBH
Defendant
Aceros de America, Inc.
Represented By
Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Mendez LLC
contact info
Saritza I. Rivera-Vega
Pietrantoni Mendez & Alvarez LLC
contact info
Arturo L.B. Hernandez-Gonzalez
Pietrantoni Mendez & Alvarez LLC
contact info
Defendant
Thyssenkrupp AG
Defendant
Norbert Goertz
Defendant
Ralf Gendruschke
Defendant
Co-Conspirator Individuals 1 through 25
Defendant
Co-Conspirator Entities A through Z
Defendant
Steel Services & Supplies, Inc.
Represented By
Lee Sepulvado-Ramos
Sepulvado, Maldonado & Couret
contact info
Gerardo Jose Cruz
Sepulvado, Maldonado & Couret
contact info
Joseph M. De Jesus-Maldonado
Sepulvado & Maldonado, Psc
contact info
Defendant
Edgardo Sola-Colon
Represented By
Felix A. Colon-Serrano
Colon Serrano Zambrana LLC
contact info
Defendant
Francis Garcia-Haghverdian
Represented By
Juan M. Masini-Soler
Juan Masini Soler Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Carolina Building Materials, Inc.
Represented By
Elena M. Olivieri
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Leslie Yvette Flores-Rodriguez
Mcconnell Valdes, LLC
contact info
Douglas Litvack
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Defendant
Carolina Building LLC
Represented By
Johanna M. Emmanuelli-Huertas
contact info
Gina Ismalia Gutierrez-Galang
Pedro Ortiz Alvarez, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Juan C. Aponte-Tolentino
Plaintiff
Tiger Group LLC
Represented By
Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Vicente & Cuebas
contact info
Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Castaner Law Offices P.S.C.
contact info
Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Vicente & Cuebas
contact info


Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
116 116 respm Sur Reply to Motion Thu 04/03 9:30 PM
SURREPLY to Motion filed by Ramon Pena-Lozada, Jorge L Santana-Castro Re:98 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 3:24-cv-1360 (PAD) and No. 3:24-cv-1582 (PAD) filed by Francis Garcia-Haghverdian, Steel Services & Supplies, Inc. filed by Ramon Pena-Lozada, Jorge L Santana-Castro.(Vilaro-Valderrabano, Charles) Modified on 4/4/2025 to correct docket relationship. (mg).
Related: [-] ply in Support of Motion to Consolidate at ECF No. 98
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
115 115 respm Reply to Motion Tue 04/01 2:51 PM
REPLY to Motion to Consolidate (ECF No. 98) filed by Steel Services & Supplies, Inc. Re:98 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 3:24-cv-1360 (PAD) and No. 3:24-cv-1582 (PAD) filed by Francis Garcia-Haghverdian, Steel Services & Supplies, Inc. filed by Steel Services & Supplies, Inc.. (Cruz, Gerardo)
Related: [-]
114 114 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 04/01 1:36 PM
ORDER: Granting112 "Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to File Surreply." The tendered surreply shall be filed electronically forthwith. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/1/2025. (AEM)
Related: [-]
113 113 respm Reply to Motion Tue 04/01 12:33 PM
REPLY to Motion filed by Carolina Building Materials, Inc., Thyssenkrupp AG Re:98 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 3:24-cv-1360 (PAD) and No. 3:24-cv-1582 (PAD) filed by Francis Garcia-Haghverdian, Steel Services & Supplies, Inc. filed by Carolina Building Materials, Inc., Thyssenkrupp AG. (Litvack, Douglas) Modified on 4/3/2025 to correct docket relationship. (mg).
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
112 112 motion Leave to File Document Mon 03/31 8:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Indirect purchaser plaintiffs Sur-Reply to Motion to Consolidate filed by Charles E. Vilaro-Valderrabano on behalf of Ramon Pena-Lozada, Jorge L Santana-Castro. Responses due by 4/14/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Vilaro-Valderrabano, Charles) Modified on 4/1/2025 to replace all caps text. (mg).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Tendered Surreply
111 111 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 03/31 11:20 AM
ORDER: Granting109 "Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief...." The tendered reply shall be filed electronically forthwith. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/31/2025. (AEM)
Related: [-]
110 110 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 03/31 11:19 AM
ORDER: Granting108 "Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief...." The tendered reply shall be filed electronically forthwith. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 3/31/2025. (AEM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
109 109 motion Leave to File Document Fri 03/28 5:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Related [+] filed by Gerardo Jose Cruz on behalf of Steel Services & Supplies, Inc.. Responses due by 4/11/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Cruz, Gerardo)
Related: [-] ply in Support of Motion to Consolidate at ECF No. 98
Att: 1 Exhibit Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Consolidate (ECF No. 98)