Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:Lisa G Wood
Referred: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Case #: 4:24-cv-00178
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Terminated:Oct 17, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of Chatham County, STCV24-01227
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Sam's East, Inc
Terminated: 10/17/2024
Represented By
Nicholas Elias Deeb
Mclain & Merritt, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
McKinley Jacobs
Terminated: 10/17/2024
Represented By
William Jarrell Degenhart
Morgan & Morgan
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, October 17, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/17 2:10 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 10/17/24. (loh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
12 12 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/15 10:06 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by McKinley Jacobs. (Degenhart, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 09/03 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by McKinley Jacobs (Degenhart, William)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 09/03 11:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2024; Discovery due by 2/20/2025; Motions due by 6/23/2025; Pretrial Order due by 8/25/2025; Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 2/20/2025; Expert Witness Report (Defendant) due by 3/24/2025; and Status Report due by 5/12/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 09/03/2024. (jlh)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 09/03 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/15/2025 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy prior to scheduled call. (KM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 08/23 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Sam's East, Inc (Deeb, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
utility Motions Referred Thu 08/22 8:54 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (csr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Wed 08/21 4:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Sam's East, Inc.(Deeb, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Leadership & Broad of Directors
7 7 misc Litigants' Bill of Rights Wed 08/21 4:28 PM
Litigants' Bill of Rights by Sam's East, Inc. (Deeb, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 08/21 4:25 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Deeb, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/15 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Elias Deeb on behalf of Sam's East, Inc (Deeb, Nicholas) (thb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/15/2024) Main Document (Correct PDF)
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/15 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Jarrell Degenhart on behalf of McKinley Jacobs (Degenhart, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 order Rule 26(f) Order Wed 08/14 5:05 PM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/14/2024. (amd)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/14 4:54 PM
NOTICE to All Counsel of Record, re1 Notice of Removal. (amd)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 08/14 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's East, Inc from the Superior Court of Chatham County, case number STCV24-01227. ( Filing fee $ 405.00, receipt number AGASDC-3881899).(amd) (amd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court Answer,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 4 (8/14/2024) Exhibit A,
Att: 5 (8/14/2024) Exhibit B
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/14 4:58 PM
Set Deadlines: Sam's East, Inc answer due 8/21/2024, and Compliance due by 8/24/2024, re2 Notice. (amd)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/14 5:09 PM
Set Deadlines: State Court Motions due by 8/28/2024, re2 Notice. (amd)
Related: [-]