Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Mark Pittman
Case #: 4:24-cv-00774
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Terminated:Jan 29, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 2:56 AM CST
Defendant
Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas
131 Starr Place
Grapevine, TX 76051
Represented By
Robert Jacob Davis
Matthews Shiels Knott Eden Davis & Beanland LLP
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Paul D Stickney
Stickney Mediations PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
United States Attorney 1100 Commerce St. Suite 300
Dallas, TX 75242
Represented By
Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jasmin Lott
Doj-Crt
contact info
Timothy J Moran
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Adam Hassanein
Doj-Crt
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
31 31 order Judgment Wed 01/29 3:40 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: This final judgment is issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a). In accordance with the Court's30 Order on this same day, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall transmit a true copy of this judgment to the parties. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/29/2025) (saw)
Related: [-]
30 30 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Wed 01/29 2:46 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Housing Authority's7 Motion and DISMISSES all of the Government's claims with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/29/2025) (saw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
29 29 respm Reply Mon 12/16 12:44 PM
REPLY filed by Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas re:7 MOTION to Dismiss (Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 12/04 10:34 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. ECF No.24 . The Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant's deadline to file a reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.7 ) is extended to December 17, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/4/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/04 9:55 AM
NOTICE of CORRECTED1 SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE ON DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND REPLY DATE re:24 MOTION to Extend Time Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion To Dismiss filed by Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas (Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/04 9:46 AM
NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE ON DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND REPLY DATE re:24 MOTION to Extend Time Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion To Dismiss filed by Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas (Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/26 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas (Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time Mon 11/25 8:04 PM
MOTION to Extend Time Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion To Dismiss filed by Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas (Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 22, 2024
23 23 respm Response/Objection Fri 11/22 7:31 PM
RESPONSE filed by United States of America re:7 MOTION to Dismiss (Lott, Jasmin)
Related: [-]
22 22 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/22 11:42 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff United States of America and Defendant Grapevine Housing Authority mutually seek to reduce the time, expense, and other burdens of discovery of documents, things, and electronically stored information (ESI). Therefore, the Parties agree to and request the entry of this Order to govern discovery obligations in this action. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/22/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 11/21 2:08 PM
MOTION Entry of Joint Electronic Discovery Order filed by United States of America (Hassanein, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 18, 2024
20 20 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 11/18 12:04 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER: Plaintiff United States of America and Defendant Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas, have stipulated to and jointly19 request entry of this proposed Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. The Court has good cause to issue this Protective Order. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/18/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
19 19 motion Protective Order Fri 11/15 4:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by United States of America (Lott, Jasmin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Confidentiality and Protective Order
Thursday, November 14, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Order For ADR Thu 11/14 12:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning October 27, 2025. Counsel and the Parties must be ready for trial on two days' notice at any time during those four weeks. Joinder of Parties due by 3/11/2025., Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/29/2025. Discovery due by 6/20/2025., Motions due by 9/16/2025. Pretrial Order due by 10/2/2025. MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Paul D Stickney as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/29/2025.) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/14/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Status Report Thu 11/14 9:14 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by United States of America. (Lott, Jasmin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 11/13 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Hassanein on behalf of United States of America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hassanein, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/31 1:03 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is the United States' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. ECF No.14 . The Court GRANTS the Motion. Accordingly, The United States' deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 7) is extended to November 22, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/31/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/30 12:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America (Lott, Jasmin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 10/30 9:45 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Abate Discovery and Scheduling Requirements Pending Determination of Motion to Dismiss. ECF No.11 . The Court DENIES the Motion. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/30/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/30 9:49 AM
Received 1 USB drive re:9 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas. Item placed in Clerk's Office under separate cover. (saw)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stay Tue 10/29 3:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay re10 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Pending Resolution Of Motion To Dismiss filed by Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas (Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 24, 2024
10 10 5 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Thu 10/24 4:22 PM
ORDER: As a result of the Scheduling Conference, counsel must prepare and submit a Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order (Joint Report) by Thursday, November 14, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/24/2024) (mmw)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Manual Filing Thu 10/24 11:23 AM
Notice of Manual Filing of Notice of Manual filing of Body Camera Videos by Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas re8 Appendix in Support,, (Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Appendix in Support Thu 10/24 11:21 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas re7 MOTION to Dismiss (Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Grapevine PD Call for Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Officer Hensley Body Camera video (placeholder),
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Officer Velez Body Camera video (placeholder),
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) GHA Lease (1 3-2020 ,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) GHA Lease termination,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Justice Court Docket,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) County Court Docket,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) GHA Lease (9 1-2021 ,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) Marriage License certificate,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) Ivey Jail Records,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) Ivey Probable Cause Affidavit
7 7 motion Dismiss Thu 10/24 11:15 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 30, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 08/30 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Jacob Davis on behalf of Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Davis, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Returned Thu 08/29 11:01 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas. Waiver sent on 8/27/2024. (Lott, Jasmin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 08/15 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jasmin Lott on behalf of United States of America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lott, Jasmin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 qcref Pittman Thu 08/15 1:47 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (saw)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 08/14 3:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/14 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Housing Authority of the City of Grapevine, Texas filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet