Washington Western District Court
Judge:Thomas S Zilly
Case #: 2:24-cv-01248
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 12:36 AM PST
Defendant
Doe(s) 1-100
Represented By
Adam T Pankratz
Ogletree Deakins (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Corporation(s) XYZ 1-100
Defendant
The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc
Represented By
Kimberly Shely
Ogletree Deakins (sea)
contact info
Adam T Pankratz
Ogletree Deakins (sea)
contact info
Defendant
The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC
Represented By
Kimberly Shely
Ogletree Deakins (sea)
contact info
Adam T Pankratz
Ogletree Deakins (sea)
contact info
Defendant
The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc
Represented By
Kimberly Shely
Ogletree Deakins (sea)
contact info
Adam T Pankratz
Ogletree Deakins (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Dylan
Represented By
Ada Ko Wong
Akw Law PC
contact info
Rolf Gardner Toren
Akw Law PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
BRP LLC
Terminated: 09/06/2024


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 17, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Thu 04/17 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Ada Ko Wong. Filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
26 26 notice Notice of Unavailability Mon 03/17 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Ada Ko Wong for Plaintiff Melissa Dylan from April 1, 2025 through April 14, 2025; April 22, 2025 through April 28, 2025; and May 28, 2025 through June 3, 2025. (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Thu 01/02 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Ada Ko Wong. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
24 24 order TSZ Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM) Tue 12/03 4:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Length of Trial: *7-8 days*. Jury Trial is set for 2/23/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/4/2025, Motions due by 9/25/2025, Discovery completed by 11/3/2025, Dispositive motions due by 12/4/2025, Motions related to expert witnesses due by 12/11/2025, Motions in Limine due by 1/30/2026, Pretrial Order due by 2/6/2026, Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/6/2026, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/6/2026, Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2026 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (HRB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
23 23 misc Joint Status Report Wed 11/27 4:02 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7-8. (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
22 22 order Protective Order Fri 11/15 12:31 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
21 21 motion Protective Order Thu 11/14 11:45 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 11/14/2024, (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/05 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rolf Gardner Toren on behalf of Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Gardner Toren, Rolf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
19 19 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Wed 10/02 5:27 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/18/2024, and the Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/2/2024. (HRB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
18 18 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Tue 10/01 4:49 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Defendants The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC. (Pankratz, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
17 17 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 09/26 6:11 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc. for The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC; Corporate Parent The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC for The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC. (Pankratz, Adam)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 09/26 5:44 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc. (Pankratz, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
15 15 order 2 - Minute Order Fri 09/13 3:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Defendants Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings, LLC and Baldwin Group Colleague, Inc. are DIRECTED to file their corporate disclosure statements pursuant to LCR 7.1 and FRCP 7.1 on or before 9/27/2024. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 09/12 9:02 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings. Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. (GMR)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent Letter & Form Thu 09/12 6:53 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/19/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (GMR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/10 3:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint for Damages by The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC.(Pankratz, Adam)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/10 3:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint for Damages by The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc.(Pankratz, Adam)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/10 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kimberly Shely on behalf of Defendants The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC, The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc. (Shely, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/10 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam T Pankratz on behalf of Defendants The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC, The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc. (Pankratz, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s) Fri 09/06 8:37 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) BRP LLC (a Florida Limited Liability Company), filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 08/30 10:11 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant BRP, LLC on 8/30/2024, filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 08/30 10:09 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings, LLC on 8/20/2024, filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 08/30 10:08 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant The Baldwin Insurance Group, Inc. on 8/20/2024, filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 08/30 10:06 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant The Baldwin Group Colleague on 8/20/2024, filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
3 3 order Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM) Tue 08/20 9:10 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 08/19 12:06 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) BRP LLC, The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC, The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc(MG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 08/19 11:56 AM
Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (MG)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Mon 08/19 12:08 PM
DISREGARD, docketed in error NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/26/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MG) Modified on 8/19/2024 strike as docketed in error (CDA)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/19 1:43 PM
Disregard Notice re Corporate Disclosure Statement to be filed by Defendants. Defendants are currently not represented. Attorney Pankratz added in error and will be removed from the docket. (CDA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 08/14 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Related [+] filed by Melissa Dylan.(Wong, Ada)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8586284
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons