Dylan v. The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas S Zilly |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01248 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 12:36 AM PST |
Defendant
Doe(s) 1-100
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corporation(s) XYZ 1-100
|
|
Defendant
The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Dylan
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
BRP LLC
Terminated: 09/06/2024
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Ada Ko Wong. Filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada) |
|
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Ada Ko Wong for Plaintiff Melissa Dylan from April 1, 2025 through April 14, 2025; April 22, 2025 through April 28, 2025; and May 28, 2025 through June 3, 2025. (Wong, Ada) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Ada Ko Wong. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wong, Ada) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Length of Trial: *7-8 days*. Jury Trial is set for 2/23/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/4/2025, Motions due by 9/25/2025, Discovery completed by 11/3/2025, Dispositive motions due by 12/4/2025, Motions related to expert witnesses due by 12/11/2025, Motions in Limine due by 1/30/2026, Pretrial Order due by 2/6/2026, Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/6/2026, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/6/2026, Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2026 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (HRB) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 7-8. (Wong, Ada) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MJV) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 11/14/2024, (Wong, Ada) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rolf Gardner Toren on behalf of Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Gardner Toren, Rolf) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/18/2024, and the Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/2/2024. (HRB) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Defendants The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC. (Pankratz, Adam) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc. for The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC; Corporate Parent The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC for The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC. (Pankratz, Adam) |
|
16 | 16
![]() CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc. (Pankratz, Adam) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MINUTE ORDER: Defendants Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings, LLC and Baldwin Group Colleague, Inc. are DIRECTED to file their corporate disclosure statements pursuant to LCR 7.1 and FRCP 7.1 on or before 9/27/2024. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MJV) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings. Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. (GMR) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/19/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (GMR) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint for Damages by The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC.(Pankratz, Adam) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint for Damages by The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc.(Pankratz, Adam) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kimberly Shely on behalf of Defendants The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC, The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc. (Shely, Kimberly) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam T Pankratz on behalf of Defendants The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC, The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc. (Pankratz, Adam) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) BRP LLC (a Florida Limited Liability Company), filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant BRP, LLC on 8/30/2024, filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada) |
|
6 | 6
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings, LLC on 8/20/2024, filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada) |
|
5 | 5
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant The Baldwin Insurance Group, Inc. on 8/20/2024, filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada) |
|
4 | 4
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant The Baldwin Group Colleague on 8/20/2024, filed by Plaintiff Melissa Dylan. (Wong, Ada) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) BRP LLC, The Baldwin Group Colleague Inc, The Baldwin Insurance Group Holdings LLC, The Baldwin Insurance Group Inc(MG) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 08/19 11:56 AM
Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (MG) |
||
utility
Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Mon 08/19 12:08 PM
DISREGARD, docketed in error NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/26/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MG) Modified on 8/19/2024 strike as docketed in error (CDA) |
||
utility
Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/19 1:43 PM
Disregard Notice re Corporate Disclosure Statement to be filed by Defendants. Defendants are currently not represented. Attorney Pankratz added in error and will be removed from the docket. (CDA) |
||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by Melissa Dylan.(Wong, Ada) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |