California Northern District Court
Judge:Maxine M Chesney
Case #: 3:24-cv-05150
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Case in other court:San Francisco Superior Court, CGC-24-615921
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 12:23 AM PST
Defendant
Gannett Co. Inc.
Represented By
David L. Yohai
Weil, Gotshal, & Manges, LLP
contact info
Blake Jacob Steinberg
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Amy Tu Quyen Le
contact info
David Ramraj Singh
Weil, Gotshal And Manges LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saber Khamooshi
Represented By
Rachael Ga-Yue Jung
Keller Grover LLP
contact info
Scot Bernstein
Law Offices Of Scot D. Bernstein
contact info
Eric A. Grover
Keller Grover LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Wu
Represented By
Rachael Ga-Yue Jung
Keller Grover LLP
contact info
Scot Bernstein
Law Offices Of Scot D. Bernstein
contact info
Eric A. Grover
Keller Grover LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
52 52 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 04/28 9:13 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING THE JUNE 20, 2025, AT 10:30 AM, INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2025 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/mmc] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2025 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ,. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
51 51 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 04/21 11:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL; SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. The Court appoints Eric. A. Grover of Keller Grover LLP as interim class counsel. Plaintiffs, through interim class counsel, are directed to file, no later than May 12, 2025, a Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 21, 2025. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]