South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-04413
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 5:20 AM EST
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-20
Defendant
E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Defendant
Chemicals, Inc.
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc.
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
AGC, Inc.
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
Defendant
3M Company
Plaintiff
Durham County, North Carolina
Represented By
Frank Paul Calamita, III
Aqualaw
contact info
Mark J Dearman
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Patrick James Lanciotti
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Paul J Napoli
contact info
Nicolle B Brito
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Andrew W Croner
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info
Nicholas H Mindicino
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Wed 08/14 9:45 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 08/13/2024), Durham County, North Carolina v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04413-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Middle District of North Carolina (wmil)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 08/14 9:43 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
1 1 72 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 08/14 9:42 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11929814.), filed by Durham County, North Carolina. Service due by 11/12/2024 (wmil)
Related: [-]