California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:24-bk-16522
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Sep 09, 2024

Debtor
Westwood Group LLC
10866 Wilshire Blvd Ste 800
Los Angeles, CA 90024-4350
Represented By
Marc Weitz
Law Office Of Marc Weitz
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Peter J Mastan (TR)
550 S Hope Street, Suite 1765
Los Angeles, CA 90071
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 08/15/2024 12:04 AM PDT
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 08/14 6:28 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:24-bk-16522] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57243665. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 08/14 6:16 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Westwood Group LLC Incomplete Filings due by 08/28/2024. (Weitz, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Wed 08/14 7:05 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Mastan (TR), Peter J with 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/9/2024 at 10:00 AM via Zoom - Mastan: Meeting ID 524 459 8731, Passcode 3158479849, Phone 1 213 833 9323. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]