Arizona District Court
Judge:Diane J Humetewa
Case #: 3:24-cv-08161
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2024
Terminated:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 09, 2025 3:27 AM MST
Defendant
John Napper
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Defendant
Linda Wallace
Plaintiff
Craig Eugene Ramsell
50 Bronco Dr.
Sedona, AZ 86336
Plaintiff
Monnie Ramsell
50 Bronco Dr.
Sedona, AZ 86336

GPO Aug 30 2024
/24. (EJA)ORDER: Plaintiffs' Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. 18) is GRANTED. ALSO ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. 10) is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to enter judgment dismissing this case with prejudice and close this case. FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 14) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/30
GPO Oct 03 2024
ORDER: Plaintiff is not entitled to proceed in forma pauperis in Appeal No. 24-5869. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall notify the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit that this Court certifies that Plaintiffs' appeal is not taken in good faith under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A) and they must therefore seek further authorization from the Court of Appeals pursuant to Rule 24(a)(5) to obtain leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiffs and the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/3/24. (EJA)

Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Thursday, October 03, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order Thu 10/03 12:57 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is not entitled to proceed in forma pauperis in Appeal No. 24-5869 FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall notify the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit that this Court certifies that Plaintiffs' appeal is not taken in good faith under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A) and they must therefore seek further authorization from the Court of Appeals pursuant to Rule 24(a)(5) to obtain leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiffs and the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/3/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
23 23 appeal USCA Order Tue 10/01 1:28 PM
REFERRAL NOTICE of USCA - Referring to the district court for the limited purpose of determining whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal or whether the appeal is frivolous or taken in bad faith. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) re: 24-5869 as to21 Notice of Appeal. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
22 22 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 09/26 2:25 PM
USCA Case Number re:21 Notice of Appeal. Case number 24-5869 Ninth Circuit. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
21 21 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 09/23 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re:19 Order,20 Clerks Judgment by Craig Eugene Ramsell, Monnie Ramsell. (Ramsell, Monnie) *Modified text on 9/23/2024 (DXD)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
20 20 order Clerks Judgment Fri 08/30 1:04 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed August 30, 2024, Plaintiffs to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. (EJA)
Related: [-]
19 19 18 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/30 1:02 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc.18 ) is GRANTED. ALSO ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc.10 ) is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is kindly directed to enter judgment dismissing this case with prejudice and close this case. FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc.14 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/30/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/30 11:42 AM
AMENDED EX PARTE First APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Craig Eugene Ramsell, Monnie Ramsell.(Ramsell, Monnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, August 26, 2024
17 17 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Mon 08/26 7:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J HUmetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 24-8161 PCT-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 25, 2024
14 14 motion Temporary Restraining Order Stay Sun 08/25 2:55 PM
EX PARTE Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION to Stay by Craig Eugene Ramsell, Monnie Ramsell.(Ramsell, Monnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Saturday, August 24, 2024
16 16 misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Mon 08/26 7:04 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Mon 08/26 7:04 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/23 6:40 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Craig Eugene Ramsell, Monnie Ramsell.(Ramsell, Monnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Annex A-C
Friday, August 16, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing Fri 08/16 1:40 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motions for Electronic Filing (docs.5 ,6 ) are GRANTED. The parties are required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 8/16/2024. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
8 8 misc Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Wed 08/14 9:44 AM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
7 7 misc New Case Opened Wed 08/14 9:43 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z. boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV24-08161-PCT-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached.(BAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 instructions
6 6 motion Allow Electronic Filing Wed 08/14 9:39 AM
MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Monnie Ramsell. (BAS)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Allow Electronic Filing Wed 08/14 9:38 AM
MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Craig Eugene Ramsell. (BAS)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing Wed 08/14 9:37 AM
REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Monnie Ramsell. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing Wed 08/14 9:36 AM
REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Craig Eugene Ramsell. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 08/14 9:36 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Craig Eugene Ramsell. (BAS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/14 9:34 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Craig Eugene Ramsell, Monnie Ramsell.(BAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 part 2,
Att: 2 part 3